State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Yuen
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Counter Claimant: Dwayne Yuen
Case Number: 1:2020cv00439
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 24 EP: CONFIDENTIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held.Given that this case has settled, the Court waives the presence of other parties/counsel for purposes of today's conference. Discussion had regarding status of stipulation to dismiss. Ms. Shibuya represents parties submitted the stipulation to dismiss to District Judge Watson's chambers last week. Ms. Shibuya currently following up with Judge Watson's staff. If necessary, Ms. Shibuya to submit duplicate original stipulation. Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 2/23/22 at 8:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326.Should the stipulation to dismiss be received prior, the Court will automatically vacate this conference. (ATT / SEALED 8:30 - 8:35 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/21/2022. (eta)
October 13, 2021 Filing 22 EP: CONFIDENTIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Parties confirm underlying lawsuit in state court has settled. Stipulation to dismiss instant case circulating for approval. Parties anticipate finalizing within 60 days as determination of good faith settlement in the state court case is required as a prerequisite to dismissal of this case. Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice due by 1/10/2022 and to be submitted to Watson_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov. Trial date and all further deadlines and court dates are vacated. Confidential Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2022 at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326.Should the stipulation to dismiss be received prior, the Court will vacate this conference. (ATT / SEALED 9:30 - 9:35 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
May 25, 2021 Filing 21 EP: CONFIDENTIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Parties report April 2021 mediation with Keith Hunter was not successful. Plaintiff to provide policy information to Defendant as directed by Judge Chang in state court cases. Parties report settlement conference in at least one of the state court cases is scheduled for 6/14/2021 before Judge Tonaki. Parties cooperating as to discovery, however, anticipate a possible stay of proceedings given ongoing criminal matters related to the underlying state court cases. Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 10/13/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326.(ATT (SEALED)/ 9:30 - 9:40 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
May 17, 2021 Filing 20 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Confidential Telephone Conference set for 5/25/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Access Code 2070326 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
February 22, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re Initial Disclosures (Shibuya, Ashley)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/21/2021. (emt, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 17 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Mr. Knapman reported that there are a total of five (5) underlying state court cases that have been consolidated for mediation, however, only 3 of those cases involve defendant Dwayne Yuen. Mediation set for April 2021 with Keith Hunter.Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 05/25/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 4/25/2022 before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/15/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by 1/18/2022 to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 5/25/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/24/2021. Discovery due by 2/25/2022. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 14, 2021 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 12/29/2020 (emt, ).
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant Dwayne Yuen's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Dwayne Yuen.(Knapman, Peter) Modified on 12/9/2020 (emt, ).
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 EO: At Plaintiff's request and with the Court's approval, Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 8:30 AM is CONTINUED to 1/21/2021 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code (2070326). (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(shm)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Dwayne Yuen served on 10/29/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 EO: The Court ADVANCES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM to 08:30 AM the same day before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Dwayne Yuen. (jni)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jni)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 12/14/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00439 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Miller, Richard)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Notice of Related Cases State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Miller, Richard)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miller, Richard)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Dwayne Yuen ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2434289.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David R. Harada-Stone
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Dwayne Yuen
Represented By: Peter S. Knapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?