Nakanelua et al v. United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO et al
Plaintiff: Jeanne Endo and Dayton Nakanelua
Defendant: United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO and American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Case Number: 1:2020cv00442
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeanne Endo, Dayton Nakanelua (Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures) (Whattoff, Randall)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/14/2020 IS CONTINUED, ONE DAY, TO 12/15/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Plaintiffs' Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Haake, Kamala) Modified on 12/8/2020 (emt, ).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Plaintiffs and Defendants' Joint 26(f) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting; Certificate of Service). (Whattoff, Randall)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendants United Public Workers, AFSCME Local 646, AFL-CIO and American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees' Scheduling Conference Statement. (Chang, Jerry)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EO: The hearing on #11 Defendants United Public Workers, AFSCME Local 646, AFL-COI and American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees' Motion to Dismiss Complaint is SET for 1/22/21 at 9:00 AM before DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition is due 12/21/20, Reply is due 12/30/20. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference (VTC). The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court.All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-3207.2. Enter your Access Code (1607265019) The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. (shm)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for failure to State a Claim Jerry P.S. Chang appearing for Defendants American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss complaint for failure to state a claim, #2 Notice to Attorneys request for judicial notice; Exhibit "A" to "N", #3 Exhibit A ISO motion, #4 Exhibit B ISO motion, #5 Exhibit C ISO motion, #6 Exhibit D ISO motion, #7 Exhibit E ISO motion, #8 Exhibit F ISO motion, #9 Exhibit G ISO motion, #10 Exhibit H ISO motion, #11 Exhibit I ISO motion, #12 Exhibit J ISO motion, #13 Exhibit K ISO motion, #14 Exhibit L ISO motion, #15 Exhibit M ISO motion, #16 Exhibit N ISO motion, #17 Certificate of Service to Plaintiffs Counsel)(Chang, Jerry) Modified on 11/29/2020 (emt, ).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EO: Defendants filed a #9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint without complying with the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake pertaining to Local Rule 7.8, such as the requirement that counsel for the movant "include with the motion a statement indicating the date, duration, and communication method of the conference and the participants in the conference" and that the statement "detail the issues discussed and resolved during the conference and the issues remaining." Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Defendants' Motion. If Defendants elect to refile the Motion, they must first comply with all requirements set forth in the Court's Civil Case Procedures. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Document stricken pursuant to ECF No. 10 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Jerry P.S. Chang appearing for Defendants American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Notice to Attorneys request for judicial notice, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Certificate of Service) (Chang, Jerry) Modified on 11/25/2020 (emt, ).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dayton Nakanelua, Jeanne Endo. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees served on 10/19/2020. (Whattoff, Randall)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dayton Nakanelua, Jeanne Endo. United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO served on 10/19/2020. (Whattoff, Randall)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 12/14/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00442 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2435086.), filed by Dayton Nakanelua, Jeanne Endo. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whattoff, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nakanelua et al v. United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Public Workers, AFSCME, Local 646, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Endo
Represented By: Kamala S. Haake
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayton Nakanelua
Represented By: Kamala S. Haake
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?