Kelley O'Neil's Inc. et al v. Ige et al
Plaintiff: Anna O'Brien's Inc., O'Toole's Irish Pub Inc., Irish Rose Saloon Inc., Dos Kalbos Enterprises LLC and Kelley O'Neil's Inc.
Defendant: Kirk Caldwell, David Y. Ige, Clare E. Connors, City and County of Honolulu and State of Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2020cv00449
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 EO: Per the request of counsel, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 08:30AM is CONTINUED to 2/23/2021 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa) Modified on 11/9/2020 (laa, ).
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 EP: Status Conference held by video teleconference (VTC).Counsel, present by (VTC) or video teleconference.Court addresses Motion (Dkt. #6 ) for Preliminary Injunction.Discussion held. Motion Hearing is set for 12/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Opposition Memorandum due: 11/24/2020Reply Memorandum due: 12/1/2020Counsel is directed to contact Judge Trader to reschedule the Rule16 conference hearing.(Reporter-Ann Matsumoto) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 EO: The Court ADVANCES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 09:00 AM to 08:30 AM the same day before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolette Winter on behalf of Kirk Caldwell, City and County of Honolulu on behalf of Kirk Caldwell, City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Nicolette)
November 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Kohn on behalf of Kirk Caldwell, City and County of Honolulu on behalf of Kirk Caldwell, City and County of Honolulu. (Kohn, Robert)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 EO: Status Conference by video conference is rescheduled for 11/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J.I. Leong on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Leong, Christopher)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Day on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Day, David)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Y. Iha on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iha, Craig)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Matthew McLean on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McLean, Nicholas)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ewan C. Rayner on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii on behalf of Clare E. Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rayner, Ewan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 EO: COURT ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCEOn October 20, 2020, Plaintiffs Kelley O'Neil's Inc., Irish Rose Saloon Inc., Anna O'Briens Inc., OToole's Irish Pub Inc., and Dos Kalbos Enterprises LLC filed their Motion for Preliminary Injunction ("Motion"). [Dkt. no. #6 .] Although the Motion makes a passing reference to a temporary restraining order ("TRO"), see Motion at 19, it is clear the relief sought is a preliminary injunction, and not a TRO, see id. (requesting the Court grant a preliminary injunction). Therefore, Motion is not construed as seeking a TRO. Accordingly, a status conference is hereby set for November 6, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. to discuss the scheduling of a hearing on the Motion. The status conference will take place via video conference. The courtroom manager will provide participants with the instructions and information to connect by video in advance of the scheduled video conference. Participants must connect to the conference at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certification of Service of #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (DiPasquale, James) Modified on 10/30/2020 (emt, ).
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint (Summonses returned executed - David Ige served 10/28/2020, Clare E. Connors served 10/28/2020, State of Hawaii served 10/28/2020, Kirk Caldwell served 10/28/2020, City and County of Honolulu served 10/28/2020) served on All Defendants on 10/28/2020, filed by Anna O'Brien's Inc., Dos Kalbos Enterprises LLC, Irish Rose Saloon Inc., Kelley O'Neil's Inc., O'Toole's Irish Pub Inc.. (DiPasquale, James) Modified on 10/30/2020 (emt, ).
October 21, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Exhibits not Labeled - Please be advised that exhibits attached to Document #1 Complaint and #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Kelley O'Neil's Inc, et al. , are not labeled. The filing party may refer to LR10.2.(d) Exhibits, Declarations, and Affidavits, which states " All exhibits attached to documents shall show the exhibit number or letter at the bottom of the first page of the exhibit." No further action is necessary. (emt, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction James Dennis DiPasquale appearing for Plaintiffs Anna O'Brien's Inc., Dos Kalbos Enterprises LLC, Irish Rose Saloon Inc., Kelley O'Neil's Inc., O'Toole's Irish Pub Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Affidavit of Robert Godaire, #9 Affidavit of William Comerford)(DiPasquale, James) Modified on 10/21/2020 (emt, ).
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/21/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00449 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kirk Caldwell, City and County of Honolulu, Claire E Connors, David Y. Ige, State of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2437680.), filed by Anna O'Brien's Inc., Irish Rose Saloon Inc., Kelley O'Neil's Inc., O'Toole's Irish Pub Inc., Dos Kalbos Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #29 Proposed Summons, #30 Civil Cover Sheet, #31 Corporate Disclosure Statement )(DiPasquale, James) Modified on 10/20/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley O'Neil's Inc. et al v. Ige et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna O'Brien's Inc.
Represented By: James Dennis DiPasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Toole's Irish Pub Inc.
Represented By: James Dennis DiPasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish Rose Saloon Inc.
Represented By: James Dennis DiPasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dos Kalbos Enterprises LLC
Represented By: James Dennis DiPasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley O'Neil's Inc.
Represented By: James Dennis DiPasquale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Y. Ige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clare E. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?