County of Maui v. Sunoco LP; et al.
Plaintiff: County of Maui
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company, BP America Inc., Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Aloha Petroleum LLC, Phillips 66, BHP Group Limited, ConocoPhillips Company, Shell Oil Company, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP Group PLC, Chevron Corp, Marathon Petroleum Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corp., BP PLC, Sunoco LP and ConocoPhillips
Case Number: 1:2020cv00470
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard Tyler Priest, #2 Declaration Declaration of Dr. Mark R. Wilson, #3 Declaration Declaration of Melvyn M. Miyagi, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW T. HEARTNEY re #91 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/17/2020. (emt, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOHN D. LOMBARDO re #89 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/17/2020. (emt, )
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JONATHAN W. HUGHES re #88 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/17/2020. (emt, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 92 EO: The Court is in receipt the #57 parties Joint REQUEST to Vacate Scheduling Conference and has reviewed the status of the case. In light of the pending #74 Motion to Remand to State Court, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 01/05/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 03/30/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 03/23/2020. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Matthew T. Heartney Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461811.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa)
December 16, 2020 Filing 90 Errata re #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jonathan W. Hughes Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461192. Declaration of Counsel Attached to Motion for PHV of Jonathan Hughes. (Bail, Lisa)
December 16, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of John D. Lombardo Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461717.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa)
December 15, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jonathan W. Hughes Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2461192.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa)
December 14, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #87 Joint Request to Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., requires the court's approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 87 Joint REQUEST to Vacate Scheduling Conference by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Miyagi, Melvyn)
December 11, 2020 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Inc., BP PLC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP America Inc... (Bail, Lisa)
December 11, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hoftiezer on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC. (Hoftiezer, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Bail on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC. (Bail, Lisa)
December 11, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa W. Munger on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC. (Munger, Lisa)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO GABRIELLA KAPP re #79 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/2/2020. (emt, )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MARGARET A. TOUGH re #78 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/2/2020. (emt, )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEVEN MARK BAUER re #77 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/2/2020. (emt, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Gabriella Kapp Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2455254.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company (Rose, Crystal)
December 1, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Margaret A. Tough Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2455253.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company (Rose, Crystal)
December 1, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Steven Mark Bauer Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2455250.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company (Rose, Crystal)
December 1, 2020 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company. (Rose, Crystal)
December 1, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal K. Rose [Adrian L. Lavarias, David A. Morris] on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company. (Rose, Crystal) Modified on 12/10/2020 (emt, ).
November 25, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Remand to State Court Victor M. Sher appearing for Plaintiff County of Maui (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court)(Sher, Victor)
November 25, 2020 Filing 73 Application re #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449112. Amended. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO THEODORE J. BOUTROUS, JR. re #38 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/24/2020. (emt, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 71 EO: In light of the #10 Order Staying Case, allowing the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/30/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 01/05/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference statements are due by 12/29/2020.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668&p (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JAMESON R. JONES re #55 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/20/2020. (emt, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SEAN C. GRIMSLEY re #54 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/20/2020. (emt, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DANIEL R. BRODY re #53 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/20/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BREON S. PEACE re #52 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BOAZ S. MORAG re #51 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO VICTOR L. HOU re #50 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STERLING A. MARCHAND re #43 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MEGAN H. BERGE re #42 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO J. SCOTT JANOE re #41 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW K. EDLING re #36 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO VICTOR M. SHER re #35 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. re #29 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DANIEL J. TOAL re #28 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CAITLIN GRUSAUSKAS re #27 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO YAHONNES CLEARY re #26 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/19/2020. (emt, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jameson R. Jones Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449576.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Rose, Crystal)
November 18, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Sean C. Grimsley Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449568.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Rose, Crystal)
November 18, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel R. Brody Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449552.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Rose, Crystal)
November 18, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice BREON S. PEACE Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449460.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Defendants BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Bronster, Margery)
November 18, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice BOAZ S. MORAG Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449459.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Defendants BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Bronster, Margery)
November 18, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice VICTOR L. HOU Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449455.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Defendants BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Bronster, Margery)
November 18, 2020 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company. (Rose, Crystal)
November 18, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal K. Rose, Adrian L. Lavarias and Dvid A. Morris on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company. (Rose, Crystal) Modified on 11/19/2020 (emt, ).
November 18, 2020 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BHP Group Limited for BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
November 18, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John Terry on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Terry, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Lanson K. Kupau on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kupau, Lanson)
November 18, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Margery S. Bronster on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc. on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Group PLC, BHP Hawaii Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bronster, Margery)
November 17, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Sterling A. Marchand) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449144.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Defendants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP (Heihre, C.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Megan H. Berge) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449138.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Defendants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP (Heihre, C.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (J. Scott Janoe) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449134.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Defendants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP (Heihre, C.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP. (Heihre, C.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Michi Momose on behalf of Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP on behalf of Aloha Petroleum LLC, Sunoco LP. (Momose, Michi) Modified on 11/17/2020 (emt, ).
November 17, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2449112.Melvyn M. Miyagi appearing for Defendants Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
November 17, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Michael Heihre on behalf of Sunoco LP on behalf of Sunoco LP, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. and Aloha Petroleum LLC . (Heihre, C.) Modified on 11/17/2020 (emt, ).
November 16, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Matthew K. Edling Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2448521.Moana Monique Lutey appearing for Plaintiff County of Maui (Lutey, Moana)
November 16, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Victor M. Sher Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2448517.Moana Monique Lutey appearing for Plaintiff County of Maui (Lutey, Moana)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SHAWN PATRICK REGAN re #19 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/12/2020. (emt, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ANN MARIE MORTIMER re #18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/12/2020. (emt, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SHANNON S. BROOME re #17 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/10/2020. (emt, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DAVID C. FREDERICK re #15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/10/2020. (emt, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRENDAN J. CRIMMINS re #14 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/10/2020. (emt, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Theodore V. Wells, Jr. of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2446731.Deborah K. Wright appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Wright, Deborah)
November 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Toal of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2446730.Deborah K. Wright appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Wright, Deborah)
November 10, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Caitlin Grusauskas of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2446729.Deborah K. Wright appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Wright, Deborah)
November 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Yahonnes Cleary of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2446727.Deborah K. Wright appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Wright, Deborah)
November 9, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mobil Corporation for ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.. (Wright, Deborah)
November 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R. Wright on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Wright, Douglas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith D. Kirschbraun on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Kirschbraun, Keith)
November 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah K. Wright on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Wright, Deborah)
November 6, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marathon Petroleum Corp. re #20 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Shawn Patrick Regan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445358., #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Ann Marie Mortimer Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445356., #16 Notice of Appearance, #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Shannon S. Broome Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445353. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Pettit, Ted)
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Pettit, Ted)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Shawn Patrick Regan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445358.Ted N. Pettit appearing for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp. (Pettit, Ted)
November 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Ann Marie Mortimer Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445356.Ted N. Pettit appearing for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp. (Pettit, Ted)
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Shannon S. Broome Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445353.Ted N. Pettit appearing for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp. (Pettit, Ted)
November 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted N. Pettit on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp. on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Pettit, Ted)
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for David C. Frederick; Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445282.Joachim P. Cox appearing for Defendants Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC (Cox, Joachim)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Brendan J. Crimmins Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2445275.Joachim P. Cox appearing for Defendants Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC (Cox, Joachim)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 Errata re #1 Notice of Removal,,, NOTICE OF ERRATA Re: Exhibit 77 of Notice of Removal by Defendants Chevron Corporation and Chevron USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit "77", #2 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
November 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall C. Whattoff on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Whattoff, Randall)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joachim P. Cox on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Cox, Joachim)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 EO: COURT (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTICIPATED MOTION TO REMAND AND (2) STAYING CASE IN PART. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON) (emt, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action with State Court Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 11/30/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00470 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 Additional Exhibits (Additional Exhibits "66" - "79") to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corp, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66, #2 Exhibit 67, #3 Exhibit 68, #4 Exhibit 69, #5 Exhibit 70, #6 Exhibit 71, #7 Exhibit 72, #8 Exhibit 73, #9 Exhibit 74, #10 Exhibit 75, #11 Exhibit 76, #12 Exhibit 77, #13 Exhibit 78, #14 Exhibit 79, #15 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 11/1/2020 (emt, ).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Additional Exhibits (Additional Exhibits "46" - "65") to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46, #2 Exhibit 47, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 50, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 52, #8 Exhibit 53, #9 Exhibit 54, #10 Exhibit 55, #11 Exhibit 56, #12 Exhibit 57, #13 Exhibit 58, #14 Exhibit 59, #15 Exhibit 60, #16 Exhibit 61, #17 Exhibit 62, #18 Exhibit 63, #19 Exhibit 64, #20 Exhibit 65)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 11/1/2020 (emt, ).
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Additional Exhibits (Additional Exhibits "26" - "45") to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38, #14 Exhibit 39, #15 Exhibit 40, #16 Exhibit 41, #17 Exhibit 42, #18 Exhibit 43, #19 Exhibit 44, #20 Exhibit 45)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 11/1/2020 (emt, ).
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation from Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 2CCV-20-0000283. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2442747), filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melvyn M. Miyagi in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Miyagi, Melvyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Maui v. Sunoco LP; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Gabriella Kapp
Represented By: Crystal K. Rose
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: David Alan Morris
Represented By: Margaret A. Tough
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: Lisa A. Bail
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Represented By: Gabriella Kapp
Represented By: Crystal K. Rose
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: David Alan Morris
Represented By: Margaret A. Tough
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Group Limited
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Breon S. Peace
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Represented By: Matthew John Terry
Represented By: Lanson K. Kupau
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Gabriella Kapp
Represented By: Jameson R. Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Brody
Represented By: Crystal K. Rose
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: David Alan Morris
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Margaret A. Tough
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Represented By: Brendan J. Crimmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Ross T. Shinyama
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Represented By: Melvyn M. Miyagi
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Hawaii Inc.
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Breon S. Peace
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Represented By: Matthew John Terry
Represented By: Lanson K. Kupau
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Group PLC
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Breon S. Peace
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Represented By: Matthew John Terry
Represented By: Lanson K. Kupau
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corp
Represented By: Ross T. Shinyama
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Represented By: Melvyn M. Miyagi
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome
Represented By: Ted N. Pettit
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Deborah K. Wright
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Keith D. Kirschbraun
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary
Represented By: Douglas R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Deborah K. Wright
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Keith D. Kirschbraun
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary
Represented By: Douglas R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: Lisa A. Bail
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco LP
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Sterling A. Marchand
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Gabriella Kapp
Represented By: Jameson R. Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Brody
Represented By: Crystal K. Rose
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: David Alan Morris
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Margaret A. Tough
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Maui
Represented By: Richelle M. Thomson
Represented By: Moana Monique Lutey
Represented By: Victor M. Sher
Represented By: Matthew K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?