Mellon v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamie M. Mellon
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00480
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Jamie M. Mellon. (Phillips, Arnold)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on December 10, 2020. (bbb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 12/06/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/26/2021 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 03/23/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 09/08/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 07/07/2021. Discovery due by 10/08/2021. Due to the uncertainty of the ongoing pandemic and to minimize traffic into the Courthouse, at this time, hard copies of any settlement conference statements need not be delivered to the Clerk's Office. Instead, parties are to submit their confidential settlement statements via email to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.The Court will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:31 - 9:36) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 EO: #5 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/07/2020 will be held telephonically.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement [Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Nicholas)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting [Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting; Certificate of Service]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Nicholas)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV200000607. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (emt, )
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/7/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00480 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Wesley) Modified on 11/6/2020 (emt, ).
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Ching, Wesley)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. [NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION; EXHIBITS A-B; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-20-0000607. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2445436), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellon v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie M. Mellon
Represented By: Arnold T. Phillips, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen Ching
Represented By: Wesley H.H. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?