Estevez v. USA
Petitioner: Michelle Estevez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00511
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Re: #3 United States of America's Answer to Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by USA. Please be advised that documents relevant to the MOTION Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody, shall be filed only in Criminal Case CR 15-00294 LEK-02, USA v. Estevez . No further action is necessary. (emt, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE (United States of America's Answer to Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 ) re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),,,, ; Certificate of Service filed by USA. (Nammar, Margaret) Modified on 12/22/2020 (emt, ).
November 25, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a file stamped copy of #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and 2 Notice of Case Assignment have been served by First Class Mail to Michelle Estevez at the address of record on November 25, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00511 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. All filings related to the MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) shall be filed only in CR 15-00294 LEK-02, USA v. Michelle Estevez.. (emt, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody - filed by Michelle Estevez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Page 6 of Motion and Attachment Re: Ground Two, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Pages 7-14 of Motion, #18 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Transmittal Letter, #22 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estevez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michelle Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Margaret C. Nammar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?