Zuru Inc. et al v. Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd. and Zuru Inc.
Defendant: Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2020cv00564
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 23 EO: #22 EX PARTE Motion For First Request To Extend Time For Service Of The Complaint And To Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/22/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 06/25/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD to allow sufficient time for Defendants to answer and for the parties to meet. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/18/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 11, 2021 Filing 22 EX PARTE Motion For First Request To Extend Time For Service Of The Complaint And To Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Glenn T. Melchinger appearing for Plaintiffs Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Melchinger)(Melchinger, Glenn)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART THE EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT DOMAINS, TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF PROCESS/PUBLICATION REGARDING EARLY DISCOVERY re #9 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/19/2021. (emt, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 EX PARTE Motion Supplemental Memorandum Per EO in ECF #19 In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For TRO (ECF #9 ) Glenn T. Melchinger appearing for Plaintiffs Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Melchinger, #2 Appendix A)(Melchinger, Glenn) Modified on 1/19/2021 (emt, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 EO: COURT ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING THEIR EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT DOMAINS, TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF PROCESS/PUBLICATION. Entering Order Temporary Sealed until 1/22/2021 (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
December 29, 2020 Filing 17 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE AND WORD LIMIT FOR THE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT DOMAINS, TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF PROCESS/PUBLICATION On December 21, 2020, Plaintiffs Zuru Inc. and Zuru (Singapore) PTE Ltd. ("Plaintiffs") filed their Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Transfer of Defendant Domains, Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Electronic Service of Process/Publication ("Ex Parte Motion"). [Dkt. no. 9.] The memorandum in support of the Ex Parte Motion should have been no more than 25 pages long or no more than 6,250 words. See Local Rule LR7.4(a), (b), (e). However, Plaintiffs have also filed a motion for leave to exceed the page and word limit, up to the greater of 43 pages or 9,680 words (Motion to Exceed). [Filed 12/21/20 (dkt. no. 8).] For the reasons stated therein, the Motion to Exceed is GRANTED. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE BY VIDEO CONFERENCE held.Plaintiff's counsel, Glenn T. Melchinger, present by video teleconference.Court addresses, timing of service, briefing for motion of TRO, early discovery request, proposed order and motion to exceed page limit.Discussion held.Court anticipates to grant the proposed order and also the motion to exceed page limits. Order to be issued. (Reporter-Debra Read) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
December 24, 2020 Filing 16 UNREDACTED EXHIBIT 1 to the Declaration of Jessica Arnaiz re to #9 - filed by Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (SEALED) (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/24/2020: #1 Exhibit 1-1 thru 1-6, #2 Exhibit 1-7 thru 1-10, #3 Exhibit 1-11 thru 1-13, #4 Exhibit 1-14 thru 1-25, #5 Exhibit 1-26 thru 1-27, #6 Exhibit 1-28) (emt, ). Modified on 12/24/2020 (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/24/2020: #7 Exhibit 1-29 thru 1-30, #8 Exhibit 1-31 thru 1-32, #9 Exhibit 1-33 thru 1-35, #10 Exhibit 1-36 thru 1-43, #11 Exhibit 1-44 thru 1-45, #12 Exhibit 1-46, #13 Exhibit 1-47, #14 Exhibit 1-48 thru 1-51, #15 Exhibit 1-52 thru 1-53, #16 Exhibit 1-54 thru 1-56) (emt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/24/2020: #17 Exhibit 1-57 thru 1-64, #18 Exhibit 1-65 thru 1-71, #19 Exhibit 1-72 thru 1-79, #20 Exhibit 1-80 thru 1-88, #21 Exhibit 1-89 thru 1-95, #22 Exhibit 1-96 thru 1-106, #23 Exhibit 1-107 thru 1-114, #24 Exhibit 1-115 thru 1-120, #25 Exhibit 1-121 thru 1-122) (emt, ).
December 24, 2020 Filing 15 UNREDACTED SCHEDULE A re #1 Complaint - filed by Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (SEALED) . (Attachments: #1 Schedule A (unredacted))(emt, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 14 EO: COURT ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN INFORMATION IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OTHER RELIEF. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT DOMAINS, TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF PROCESS/PUBLICATION On December 21, 2020, Plaintiffs Zuru Inc. and Zuru (Singapore) PTE Ltd. ("Plaintiffs") filed their Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Temporary Transfer of Defendant Domains, Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Electronic Service of Process/Publication ("Ex Parte Motion"). [Dkt. no. #9 .] Plaintiffs' counsel is ORDERED to appear at a status conference regarding the Ex Parte Motion on December 28, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The status conference will be held by video conference, and the Courtroom Manager will send counsel the details.Plaintiffs have filed a redacted exhibit in support of the Ex Parte Motion. [Motion, Decl. of Jessica Arnaiz, Exh. 1.] Plaintiffs represent that the total size of the exhibits for the Ex Parte Motion is more than 80 MB, and the size of the unredacted version of Exhibit 1 is more than 130 MB. [Ex Parte Motion to Temporarily Seal Certain Information in Plaintiffs' motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief, filed 12/22/20 (dkt. no. #10 ), at 1 n.1.] On December 22, 2020, Plaintiffs' counsel attempted to send the unredacted version of Exhibit 1 to this Court for consideration using a Dentons file-sharing program. Plaintiffs' counsel is HEREBY INFORMED that this Court will not accept documents transmitted in that manner, nor will this Court accept counsels alternative suggestion - a series of approximately twenty emails, each with an attachment that is approximately 10 MB in size.Plaintiffs' counsel is ORDERED to submit the unredacted version of Exhibit 1 to this Court on a CD, DVD, or portable storage drive. The CD, DVD, or portable storage drive must be hand-delivered to this Court during regular business hours. Plaintiffs counsel must call this Courts chambers at 541-1331 to make the appropriate arrangements, as the courthouse is only open for in- person court appearances. This Court also notes that the courthouse is closed on December 24 and 25, 2020. Any documents that Plaintiffs submit in the future which cannot be transmitted in a single email message must also be submitted in this manner. IT IS SO ORDERED. Status Conference is set for 12/28/2020 at 02:30 PM in Video Conference before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The Courtroom manager will provide participants with the instructions and information to connect by video in advance of the scheduled video conference. Participants must connect to the conference at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. re #11 Transmittal of Documents, REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK (AO 120), Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc.. (Melchinger, Glenn)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 120 Report to the Director. (jni)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Temporarily Seal Certain Information in #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief; Declaration of Glen Melchinger; (Proposed) Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Temporarily Seal Certain Information in Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Other Relief Glenn T. Melchinger appearing for Plaintiffs Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (Melchinger, Glenn) Modified on 12/22/2020 (emt, ).
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 EX PARTE Motion FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT DOMAINS, TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF PROCESS/PUBLICATION, Glenn T. Melchinger appearing for Plaintiffs Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Word Count, #2 Declaration of Jessica Arnaiz, #3 Declaration of Stephen Drysdale, #4 Declaration of Katie P. Kavanaugh, #5 Declaration of Glenn T. Melchinger, #6 Exhibit 1-1 - 1-6, #7 Exhibit 1-7 - 1-10, #8 Exhibit 1-11 - 1-13, #9 Exhibit 1-14 - 1-25, #10 Exhibit 1-26 - 1-27, #11 Exhibit 1-28, #12 Exhibit 1-29 - 1-30, #13 Exhibit 1-31 - 1-32, #14 Exhibit 1-33 - 1-35, #15 Exhibit 1-36 - 1-43, #16 Exhibit 1-44 - 1-45, #17 Exhibit 1-46, #18 Exhibit 1-47, #19 Exhibit 1-48 - 1-51, #20 Exhibit 1-52 - 1-53, #21 Exhibit 1-54 - 1-56, #22 Exhibit 1-57 - 1-64, #23 Exhibit 1-65 - 1-71, #24 Exhibit 1-72 - 1-79, #25 Exhibit 1-80 - 1-88, #26 Exhibit 1-89 - 1-95, #27 Exhibit 1-96 - 1-106, #28 Exhibit 1-107 - 1-114, #29 Exhibit 1-115 - 1-120, #30 Exhibit 1-121 - 1-122, #31 Exhibit 2, #32 Exhibit 3 (Assignment), #33 Exhibit 4 - Mark Monitor Reports, #34 Exhibit 5 - Seizure Statistics, #35 Exhibit 6 - Report Economic Impacts, #36 Exhibit 7 - Registry Agreement, #37 Exhibit 8 - Hague Status of Signatures, #38 Exhibit 9 - China Civil Law Procedure)(Melchinger, Glenn)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE AND WORD LIMIT FOR THE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT DOMAINS, TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF PROCESS/PUBLICATION], Glenn T. Melchinger appearing for Plaintiffs Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn T. Melchinger)(Melchinger, Glenn)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (jni)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 2/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00564 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc.. (Melchinger, Glenn)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd., Zuru Inc.. (Melchinger, Glenn)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; [Redacted] SCHEDULE A; [Proposed] SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, against Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2463294.), filed by Zuru Inc., Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 [Redacted] SCHEDULE A, #2 [Proposed] SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION)(Melchinger, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuru Inc. et al v. Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuru (Singapore) PTE, Ltd.
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuru Inc.
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?