Bachman v. Kaanapali Sails, Inc.
Plaintiff: Janet Bachman
Defendant: Kaanapali Sails, Inc. doing business as Teralani, John Does 1-20, Doe Governmental Entities 1-20, Doe Partnerships 1-20, Jane Does 1-20 and Doe Corporations 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv00013
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Janet Bachman. (Lowenthal, Jacob)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on February 11, 2021. (bbb)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 02/23/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 01/11/2022 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 04/23/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 09/22/2021. Discovery due by 12/23/2021. Due to the uncertainty of the ongoing pandemic and to minimize traffic into the Courthouse, at this time, hard copies of any settlement conference statements need not be delivered to the Clerk's Office. Instead, parties are to submit their confidential settlement statements via email to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:00 - 9:04) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 10, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY-Incorrect Attorney Filer- Please be advised that Document #12 Answer to Complaint was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. The filing party shall use its discretion should they feel the necessity to re-submit a corrected filing. (jo)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaanapali Sails, Inc..(Nakano, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaanapali Sails, Inc.. (Nakano, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement by Kaanapali Sails, Inc.. (Nakano, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff; Certificate of Service. (Lowenthal, Jacob)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Lowenthal, Jacob)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Lowenthal, Jacob)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 EO: At Plaintiff's request due to a conflict in counsel's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/08/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 02/11/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii, 2CCV-21-0000002 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Case Detail Docket Sheet, #3 Pleadings, #4 Mailing Envelope) (jni)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kaanapali Sails, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/8/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00013 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kaanapali Sails, Inc. from Second Circuit Court, case number 2CCV-21-0000002. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2469029), filed by Kaanapali Sails, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bachman v. Kaanapali Sails, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaanapali Sails, Inc. doing business as Teralani
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Bachman
Represented By: Jacob K. Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?