Ball v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Ball
Defendant: Non-Profit Organizations 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Walmart Inc. and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv00019
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on March 10, 2021. (bbb)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held in chambers. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Non-Jury Trial is set for 03/07/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 01/25/2022 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 12/01/2021 at 10:15 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/06/2021. Discovery due by 01/07/2022. If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298 at anytime.Due to the uncertainty of the ongoing pandemic and to minimize traffic into the Courthouse, at this time, hard copies of any settlement conference statements need not be delivered to the Clerk's Office. Instead, parties are to submit their confidential settlement statements via email to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:30 - 9:35) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff Christopher Ball's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Healy, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2021 (emt, ).
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of Rule 26(F) Meeting of the Parties. (Mackey, John)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Mackey, John)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Mackey, John)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT WALMART INC. TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/22/2021. Walmart Inc. answer due 3/2/2021. (emt, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT WALMART INC. TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND ORDER -. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/4/2021. Walmart Inc. answer due 2/16/2021. (emt, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 EO: In light of the #7 First Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Walmart Inc to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Order, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/22/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 03/09/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 03/02/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT WALMART INC. TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, FILED ON 2/2/21 AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/19/2021. Walmart Inc. answer due 2/2/2021. (emt, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00019 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Mackey, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Walmart Inc.. (Mackey, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 20-0000922. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2469929), filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mackey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non-Profit Organizations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: John S. Mackey
Represented By: Edmund K. Saffery
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ball
Represented By: Charles H. Brower
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?