Grandinetti v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II
Defendant: Vice President Michael Pence, Attorney General William Barr, Jeff Rosen, Presidents, Vice Presidents, Attorney Generals of the United States, President, USA Donald J. Trump, United States of America, Biden Administration, Kamala Harris and Joseph Biden
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2021cv00029
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 USCA Case Number 21-15328 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II: This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 06-80108 . The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it will be permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 26, 2021.
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL, Proof of Service re #3 , #4 - by Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II. Filing fee $ DUE. USCA NO. 21-15328 . (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) Modified on 2/26/2021 (emt, ).
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 1/29/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #2 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 1, 2021.
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 1/29/2021. (1) To the extent Grandinetti seeks relief under 28 U.S.C. 2254, his Petition and any request for a certificate of appealability are DENIED. (2) To the extent Grandinetti seeks relief under 42 U.S.C. 1983, his claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. This does not prevent Grandinetti from raising any civil rights claims in a new action with concurrent payment of the civil filing fee. (3) The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no action on documents filed herein beyond processing a notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on February 1, 2021.
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 Presidential WRITS OF (MDL) HABEAS CORPUS, Illegal Custody, Military Detention, Federal Transfer Status, and Unlawful Federal Statutes, contested, etc. against All Defendants - filed by Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandinetti v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Anthony Grandinetti, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice President Michael Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presidents, Vice Presidents, Attorney Generals of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President, USA Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biden Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?