Kiva Health Brands LLC v. Goodvitamin Foods Pvt. Ltd.
Plaintiff: Kiva Health Brands LLC
Defendant: Goodvitamin Foods Pvt. Ltd. and Does 1-20 Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2021cv00042
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 EO: Per Plaintiff's request, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 09:00AM is CONTINUED to 5/19/2021 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 19, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of #1 Complaint, #4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO 120) has been served by First Class Mail to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, Mail Stop 8, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 120 Report to the Director. (jni)
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Goodvitamin Foods Pvt. Ltd. (jni)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 3/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00042 HG-RT on all further pleadings.(jni)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kiva Health Brands LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Kiva Health Brands LLC. (Dang, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kiva Health Brands LLC. (Dang, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Dang, Nathaniel)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Goodvitamin Foods PVT. LTD. (Filing fee $402; Receipt #0975-2471948), filed by Goodvitamin Foods PVT. LTD. Kiva Health Brands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - Exhibit C-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dang, Nathaniel) Docket Text Modified on 1/14/2021. (jni) Modified on 1/15/2021 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiva Health Brands LLC v. Goodvitamin Foods Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodvitamin Foods Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiva Health Brands LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Dang
Represented By: Colin O. Miwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?