Delgado v. Wilkinson, et al.
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Delgado
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Monty Wilkinson, Christopher M. Robinson and David Gulick
Case Number: 1:2021cv00058
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #17 Notice of Dismissal filed by Juan Manuel Delgado requires the court's approval (see LR41.1). If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, )
February 1, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please disregard the Advisory Entry entered earlier today, on February 1, 2021. The Clerk's Office will close this case, pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal, ECF No. #17 , filed on January 29, 2021. (emt, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal Juan Manuel Delgado. (Cosio, Fernando)
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Monty Wilkinson. (emt, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS returned executed as to Kenneth Cucinelli by Juan Manuel Delgado . Kenneth Cucinelli served on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service Cuccinelli)(Cosio, Fernando) Modified on 1/26/2021 (emt, ).
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS returned executed as to David Gulick by Juan Manuel Delgado. David Gulick served on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof service Gulick)(Cosio, Fernando) Modified on 1/26/2021 (emt, ).
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE SUMMONS returned executed as to Christopher M. Robinson. Christopher M. Robinson served on 1/25/2021. by Juan Manuel Delgado Proof of Service Robinson (Cosio, Fernando) Modified on 1/26/2021 (emt, ).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) DENYING AS-CONSTRUED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND (2) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/25/2021. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and/or as moot. Plaintiff may have until February 1, 2021 to respond to this Order to Show Cause. Failure to file a timely response will result in this case being dismissed for the reasons set forth herein. (emt, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Christopher M. Robinson, USCIS. (emt, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to David Gulick, USCIS. (emt, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kenneth Cuccinelli, Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (emt, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Supplement proposed summons)(Cosio, Fernando)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Supplement proposed summons, #2 Supplement proposed summons, #3 Supplement proposed summons, #4 Supplement proposed summons)(Cosio, Fernando)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 3/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBITS "A THROUGH D" to #1 Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus and Request for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by JUAN MANUEL DELGADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cosio, Fernando) Modified on 1/22/2021 (emt, ).
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00058 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Original COMPLAINT for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus and Request for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order against All Plaintiffs All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2475425.), filed by JUAN MANUEL DELGADO. Juan Manuel Delgado. (Cosio, Fernando) Modified on 1/22/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Wilkinson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Delgado
Represented By: Fernando L. Cosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?