Pomare v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carinne Pomare
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, United Airlines, Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00062
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on March 23, 2021. (bbb)
March 22, 2021 Filing 19 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held.Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 04/05/2022 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 02/22/2022 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 06/01/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 01/05/2022 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/03/2021. Discovery due by 02/04/2022. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:30 - 9:50) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Carinne Pomare and Defendant United Airlines, Inc. Please continue to reflect case number CV 21-00062 KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 Consent Election Form
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 EO: The #4 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for03/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD will be held via telephone.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Zorc, Eileen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff Carinne Pomare's Scheduling Conference Statement (Zeigler, Joanna) Modified on 3/18/2021 (jo)
March 2, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Murakami, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines, Inc for United Airlines, Inc... (Zorc, Eileen)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint DEFENDANT UNITED AIRLINES, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED JANUARY 25, 2021 by United Airlines, Inc..(Zorc, Eileen)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 Consent Election Form
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carinne Pomare (Murakami, Mark)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carinne Pomare. United Airlines, Inc. served on 1/26/2021. (Murakami, Mark)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United Airlines, Inc. (jni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 3/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00062 KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Carinne Pomare. (Murakami, Mark)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Airlines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2476377.), filed by Carinne Pomare. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Summons)(Murakami, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomare v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen C. Zorc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carinne Pomare
Represented By: Mark M. Murakami
Represented By: Joanna C. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?