Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Paradise Landscape Maintenance
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund, Annuity Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds and Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Paradise Landscape Maintenance
Case Number: 1:2021cv00089
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, a Hawaii corporation, re ECF No. #11 Amendment to ECF #12 (jo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, a Hawaii corporation, re ECF No. #11 (jo)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST Default Judgment by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Declaration of Troy Tonini, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ikeda, Ashley)
March 15, 2021 Filing 10 EO: Based on the Entry of Default, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file the appropriate motion for default judgment no later than 5/12/2021. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paradise Landscape Maintenance pursuant to ECF #8 (jo)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Entry of Default by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Ikeda, Ashley)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. All Defendants. Paradise Landscape Maintenance served on 2/14/2021 (Ikeda, Ashley) Modified on 2/23/2021 (jo)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notie to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/12/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Paradise Landscape Maintenance. (emt, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00089 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Paradise Landscape Maintenance ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2484781.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds v. Paradise Landscape Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Landscape Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?