Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund v. Geist
Plaintiff: Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund, Kurt Freeman, Pat Lopresti, Teamster Members Retirement Plan and Mal Pritzker
Defendant: David W. Geist
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kurt Freeman, Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund, Pat Lopresti, Mal Pritzker, Teamster Members Retirement Plan re #17 Scheduling Conference Statement (Watts, Matthew)
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Watts, Matthew) Modified on 5/2/2021 (emt, ).
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Rule 26(f) REPORT of the Parties' Planning Meeting . (Watts, Matthew) Modified on 5/2/2021 (emt, ).
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 David W. Geist's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Michael) Modified on 4/29/2021 (emt, ).
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David W. Geist David W. Geist's First Request For Admissions Directed To Plaintiffs (Collins, Michael)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 David W. Geist's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Summons with Jury Demand by David W. Geist. (Attachments: #1 Affirmative Defenses, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Certificate of Service)(Collins, Michael) Modified on 4/1/2021 (emt, ).
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kurt Freeman, Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund, Pat Lopresti, Mal Pritzker, Teamster Members Retirement Plan re #1 Complaint, (Ikeda, Ashley)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint; Summons served on David W. Geist on 03/13/2021, filed by Kurt Freeman, Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund, Pat Lopresti, Mal Pritzker, Teamster Members Retirement Plan. (Chang, Jerry)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW D. WATTS re #8 , #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/16/2021. (emt, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Matthew D. Watts Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2497675. Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jerry P.S. Chang appearing for Plaintiffs Kurt Freeman, Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund, Pat Lopresti, Mal Pritzker, Teamster Members Retirement Plan (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Chang, Jerry)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Matthew D. Watts Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2497675.Jerry P.S. Chang appearing for Plaintiffs Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund, Pat Lopresti, Mal Pritzker, Teamster Members Retirement Plan (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel and Local Consent, #2 [Proposed] Order)(Chang, Jerry)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/10/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David W. Geist. (emt, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00125 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund. (Ikeda, Ashley)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2495627.), filed by Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund v. Geist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graphic Communications Conference International Brotherhood of Teamsters National Pension Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Freeman
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Lopresti
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamster Members Retirement Plan
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mal Pritzker
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Represented By: Matthew D. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Geist
Represented By: Michael John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?