Sanders v. Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region X Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Sanders
Defendant: Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region X Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00163
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 4/20/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ECF No. 10 Minute Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Daniel R. Sanders served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 20, 2021.
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 EO: On 4/1/21, the Court dismissed the Complaint with leave to amend and denied Plaintiff's IFP Application. The Court imposed a deadline of 4/15/21 to pay the filing fee and cautioned that failure to do so would result in the automatic dismissal of the action. To date, Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee. Accordingly, the case is dismissed. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #1 , #2 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 4/1/2021. In accordance with the foregoing, Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaint with leave to amend as permitted herein and (2) DENIES the IFP Application. ECF No. 2. Plaintiff's deadline to pay the filing fee is April 15, 2021. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, he must comply with the following requirements: (1) The deadline to file an amended complaint is May 3, 2021; (2) The amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint"; (3) Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above; and (4) Plaintiff may not add new causes of action without leave of court. Any amendments must be limited to the causes of action asserted, if legally sound. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to timely pay the filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action. Dismissal will also result if Plaintiff fails to file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Daniel R. Sanders shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 2, 2021.
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00163 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Daniel R. Sanders served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on March 31, 2021.
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 EO: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a district judge. Judge Wes Reber Porter will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Consent Election Form ( "Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge") . (emt, ) Modified on 3/31/2021 (emt, ).
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form )(emt, )
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/24/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(emt, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Daniel R. Sanders. (emt, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Trial against Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region X Social Security Administration - filed by Daniel R. Sanders.(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region X Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region X Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?