Irwin et al v. 90210 Management Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Shelli Irwin and James R. Irwin
Defendant: John Does 1-10, 90210 Management Company, LLC, Jane Doe 1, Doe Corporations 1-5, Jane Does 2-10 and Doe Entities 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv00169
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/3/2021. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are ORDERED TO APPEAR for a confidential settlement conference, on January 20, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.(jni)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/3/2021.NON-JURY trial in this matter will commence before the Honorable Alan C. Kay, Senior United States District Judge on May 3, 2022, at 9:00 A.M.A final pretrial conference shall be held on March 22, 2022, at 10:00 AM before the Honorable Wes Reber Porter, United States Magistrate Judge.(jni)
May 3, 2021 Filing 14 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE The Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. A Rule 16 SchedulingOrder to be issued.Discussion held regarding consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Non-Jury Trial is set for 5/3/2022 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/22/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements due by January 13, 2022. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/1/2021. Discovery due by 3/4/2022. (ATT / 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Kelley, Fredrick)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT 90210 MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLCS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Hughes, Thomas)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James R. Irwin, Shelli Irwin Re: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT 90210 MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Kelley, Fredrick)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James R. Irwin, Shelli Irwin Re: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT 90210 MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC (Kelley, Fredrick)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by James R. Irwin, Shelli Irwin. (Kelley, Fredrick)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by 90210 Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hughes, Thomas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 90210 Management Company, LLC 90210 1RAI to Pltf Shelli Irwin (Ma, Stacy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 90210 Management Company, LLC 90210 1RAI to Pltf James Irwin (Ma, Stacy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 90210 Management Company, LLC 90210 1RPOD to Pltfs (Ma, Stacy)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT OF THE PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by 90210 Management Company, LLC. (Ma, Stacy)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/3/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00169 ACK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 90210 Management Company, LLC from Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 2ccv-20-0000119. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2505558), filed by 90210 Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet , #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement , #5 Certificate of Service)(Hughes, Thomas) Modified on 4/1/2021 (emt, ).
April 1, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the Corporate Disclosure Statement, appended to docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by 90210 Management Company, LLC, should be filed as a separate document, using the filing event "Corporate Disclosure Statement" located in the "Other Documents" category. No further action is necessary. (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irwin et al v. 90210 Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 90210 Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew K. Recktenwald
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelli Irwin
Represented By: Fredrick M. Kelley
Represented By: Alexander Loftus Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Irwin
Represented By: Fredrick M. Kelley
Represented By: Alexander Loftus Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?