Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds v. Sonny's Wall Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds, Vacation & Holiday Fund, Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Market Recovery Program, Drywall Training Fund, 401-K Fund, Financial Security Fund and Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-100, Sonny's Wall Service, LLC, Governmental Units 1-100, John and Jane Does 1-100, Doe Entities 1-100, Doe Partnerships 1-100, Doe Governmental Units 1-100, John Does 1-100 and Jane Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2021cv00192
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 21-00192 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 EO: In light of the #13 Clerk's Entry of Default, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/21/2021 is VACATED. Plaintiff shall seek default judgment no later than 07/16/2021. The Court directs the Clerks Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Judge Mansfield will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sonny's Wall Service, LLC pursuant to ECF #12 (jo)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 EX PARTE Request to Clerk for Entry of Default of Defendant Sonny's Wall Service, LLC Jeffrey P. Miller appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey P. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Main Document Proposed Entry of Default, #4 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EO: On June 15, 2021, Plaintiffs filed ex parte a #10 Request to Clerk for Entry of Default of Defendant Sonny's Wall Service, LLC ("Ex Parte Request"). The Court has carefully reviewed the Ex Parte Request and finds that it fails to comply with the Local Rules. Local Rule 7.10 requires "[a]ny ex parte application [to] include a declaration that states why... a motion could not be submitted and sets forth the positions of other parties with respect to the request, if known." Because Plaintiffs failed to comply with the Local Rules, and because there appears to be no reason for Plaintiffs to seek the requested relief on an ex parte basis, the Court DENIES the Ex Parte Request. Such denial is without prejudice to Plaintiffs re-filing a proper motion (1) that complies with Local Rule 7.10, or (2) as a public document by selecting a filing event from the "motions" category and serving a copy of such a motion in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 06/16/2021. (mansfield2)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 EX PARTE Request to Clerk for Entry of Default of Defendant Sonny's Wall Service, LLC Jeffrey P. Miller appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey P. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Main Document Proposed Entry of Default, #4 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds. (Miller, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sonny's Wall Service, LLC. (jni)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/21/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00192 KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miller, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2513839.), filed by Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/21/2021 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds v. Sonny's Wall Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny's Wall Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governmental Units 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Carpenters Trust Funds
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Market Recovery Program
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drywall Training Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 401-K Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Security Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?