Suh v. Lee
Plaintiff: Hae Suk Suh
Defendant: Dong Woo Lee, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Gaya International LLC, Shawn Lee, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Sirinan LLC and Connie Hee Lee
Case Number: 1:2021cv00194
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 26 EO: The Court ONVERTS the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference into a Telephonic Status Conference for the same date of 06/21/2021 but advanced from 9:30 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Dong Woo Lee aka Shawn Lee, Gaya International, LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, and Sirinan, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complai filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Muzzi, #2 Declaration of Soyeon Hiremath, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Muzzi, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hae Suk Suh re #23 Amended Complaint, (Muzzi, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Gaya International LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, Dong Woo Lee, filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muzzi, Christopher) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jo)
June 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:On June 2, 2021, Defendants Dong Woo Lee, Gaya International LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, and Sirinan LLC filed:MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (ECF No. #21 ). Plaintiff shall file her Opposition on or before Wednesday, June 16, 2021.Defendants shall file their Reply on or before Tuesday, June 22, 2021.A hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #21 ) shall be held on Monday, June 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m, before the Honorable Helen Gillmor by telephone.Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaiis current Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Pandemic and Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings pursuant to the CARES Act, this hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via the Court's AT&T teleconference services. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. PARTICIPANT INSTRUCTIONS:Step 1: Dial 1-888-684-8852.Step 2: Enter "7273604#" (Access Code followed by the pound (#) sign).Step 3: Participant will hear system say, "To join the conference as host press star (*), otherwise press pound (#)." Enter '#'.The system will then say "The host has not yet arrived. Please stand by." Participant should continue to hold until the Host arrives.(rls, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Dong Woo Lee aka Shawn Lee, Gaya International, LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, and Sirinan, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [Dkt.1]; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Dong Woo Lee; Declaration of John Rhee John S. Rhee appearing for Defendants Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Sirinan LLC, Gaya International LLC, Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Dong Woo Lee, Connie Hee Lee (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dong Woo Lee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Declaration John Rhee, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Rhee, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sirinan LLC. (Rhee, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keeaumoku Development, LLC. (Rhee, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC. (Rhee, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gaya International LLC. (Rhee, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse J.T. Smith on behalf of Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Sirinan LLC on behalf of Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Sirinan LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS to Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel)(Smith, Jesse)
May 13, 2021 Filing 15 FIRST STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/13/2021. Deadline for defendants to file their responses to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to June 2, 2021.(jo)
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 [Proposed] STIPULATION Extending Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC, Gaya International LLC, Keeaumoku Development, LLC, Connie Hee Lee, Dong Woo Lee, Sirinan LLC. (Rhee, John) Modified on 5/13/2021 (jo)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued (Dong Woo Lee aka Shawn Lee and Connie Hee Lee served 5/3/2021) Acknowledgement filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Muzzi, Christopher)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Connie Hee Lee, Dong Woo Lee re #11 Acknowledgment of Service Withdrawal of DKT 11 Connie Hee Lee, Dong Woo Lee. (Rhee, John)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 **Docket Entry Withdrawn Pursuant to ECF #12 ** ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed May 3, 2021 Acknowledgement filed by Connie Hee Lee, Dong Woo Lee. (Rhee, John) Modified on 5/5/2021 (jo)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Keeaumoku Development, LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Sirinan LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Gaya International LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hae Suk Suh. Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC served on 4/23/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/21/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00194 HG-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hae Suk Suh Notice of Pendency Action Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Muzzi, Christopher)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dong Woo Lee ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2513682.), filed by Hae Suk Suh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Muzzi, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suh v. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dong Woo Lee
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeaumoku Development, LLC
Represented By: Jesse J.T. Smith
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaya International LLC
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Lee
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirinan LLC
Represented By: Jesse J.T. Smith
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hee Lee
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hae Suk Suh
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Leila M Rothwell Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?