Eberhart v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Erika Eberhart and Marie Martel
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-50, Doe Corporations 1-50, Doe Partnerships 1-50, Doe Unincorporated Associations 1-50, Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-50, Jane Does 1-50, John Does 1-50, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and Doe NonProfit Corporations 1-50
Case Number: 1:2021cv00203
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/24/2021. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are ORDERED TO APPEAR for a confidential settlement conference, on March 10, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. (jo)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/24/2021. (jo)
May 24, 2021 Filing 16 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCEThe Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued.Discussion held regarding consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 5/24/2022 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 3/10/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Teleconference before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER.Settlement Conference statements due by 3/3/2022. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/22/2021. Discovery due by 3/28/2022. (ATT / 9:00 a.m. - 9:11 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Gregory)
May 14, 2021 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Woodward, Amy)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Planning Meeting Plaintiffs Erika Eberhart and Marie Martel, and Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company's Joint Planning Report Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) and Local Rule 26.1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Woodward, Amy)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Gregory)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MELISSA LYNN O'CONNOR re: #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/28/2021. MELISSA LYNN O'CONNOR, ESQ. (Firm: DKM Law Group, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company(jo)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DAMIAN PERELSON STUTZ re: #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/28/2021. DAMIAN PERELSON STUTZ, ESQ. (Firm: DKM Law Group, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (jo)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOSHUA NATHAN KASTAN re: #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/28/2021. JOSHUA NATHAN KASTAN, ESQ. (Firm: DKM Law Group, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (jo)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Melissa Lynn O'Connor Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2516584.Gregory K. Markham appearing for Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Markham, Gregory)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Damian Perelson Stutz Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2516581.Gregory K. Markham appearing for Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Markham, Gregory)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Joshua Nathan Kastan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2516577.Gregory K. Markham appearing for Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Markham, Gregory)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0000401 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (jni)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/24/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00203 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA Casualty Insurance Company for USAA Casualty Insurance Company.. (Markham, Gregory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-21-0000401., filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (0975-2515332$ 402.00) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 3C, #6 Exhibit 3D, #7 Jury Demand, #8 Certificate of Service)(Markham, Gregory) Modified on 4/23/2021 (emt, ).
April 23, 2021 PAYMENT of Fees - Payment for Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0975-2515332.. (Markham, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eberhart v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Eberhart
Represented By: Amy L. Woodward
Represented By: William H. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Martel
Represented By: Amy L. Woodward
Represented By: William H. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Unincorporated Associations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory K. Markham
Represented By: Cherise Christine Braxton-Brooks
Represented By: Melissa Lynn O'Connor
Represented By: Damian Perelson Stutz
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Kastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe NonProfit Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?