Long v. Noland, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: De Witt Lamar Long
Defendant: Lyle Antonio, Hamada, Sgt. Leaialaimatafao, Scott O. Harrington and Chaplain Charles Noland, Jr.
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2021cv00205
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re: #1 - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 6/4/2021. (1) Long's free exercise claim in Count IV against COS Antonio may proceed. (2) Long's remaining claims are DISMISSED with leave granted to amend. (3) If he chooses, Long may file an amended complaint that addresses the noted deficiencies in his claims on or before Monday, July 12, 2021. (4) IN THE ALTERNATIVE to filing an amended complaint, Long may notify the Court in writing on or before Monday, July 12, 2021 that he elects to proceed solely with his free exercise claim in Count IV against COS Antonio. If Long fails to file either a further amended complaint or a notice of election by Monday, July 12, 2021, the Court will direct the Complaint to be served, as limited by this Order. (5) The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Long a prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he may comply with the directions of this Order, if he elects to file an amended complaint. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - De Witt Lamar Long will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 4, 2021.
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re: #2 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/27/2021. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - De Witt Lamar Long will be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 27, 2021. A copy of the order will be served by First Class Mail on April 27, 2021 to the Warden and Financial Office at Saguaro Correctional Center, 1250 EAST ARICA ROAD, ELOY, AZ 85131. Shelley Nobriga Harrington, Esq. and Laurie Nadamoto, Esq., Department of Public Safety Litigation Coordinators and the Financial Department for the District of Hawaii received the order electronically.
April 26, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, and #2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 4/27/2021. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jni)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff De Witt Lamar Long (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT; JURY DEMAND TRIAL against All Defendants - filed by De Witt Lamar Long. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Noland, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Leaialaimatafao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott O. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Charles Noland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De Witt Lamar Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?