E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc. v. Hodges
Plaintiff: Buck Financial Services, Inc. and E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc.
Defendant: Justin Hodges
Case Number: 1:2021cv00222
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Defend Trade Secrets Act (of 2016)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM is CONTINUED to 09:30 AM the same day (7/12/2021) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Wilson, Richard) Modified on 7/6/2021 (emt, ).
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement. (Yeh, Christopher)
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Wilson, Richard) Modified on 7/6/2021 (emt, ).
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Access Code 2070326 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Justin Hodges. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wilson, Richard) Modified on 6/14/2021 (emt, ).
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc., Buck Financial Services, Inc.. Justin Hodges served on 5/17/2021. (Yeh, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buck Financial Services, Inc., E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buck Enterprises Inc., a Colorado corporation for Buck Financial Services, Inc., E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc... (Yeh, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Justin Hodges. (jni)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/12/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00222 DKW-RT on all further pleadings.(jni)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc. (Yeh, Christopher)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Hodges (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2523131.), filed by E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 (Proposed) Summons)(Yeh, Christopher) Modified on 5/11/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc. v. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hodges
Represented By: Richard E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buck Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Yeh
Represented By: Andrea Lux Miyashita
Represented By: James S. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A. Buck Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Yeh
Represented By: Andrea Lux Miyashita
Represented By: James S. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?