Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett v. Ige et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett and Jeffrey S. Jarrett
Defendant: Michael Victorino, All Members of the Hawaii Senate, Ronald Couch, Josh Green, Does A-0001 thru Z-9999, Scott Saiki, All Members of the Hawaii House of Representative, Keani Rawlins-Fernandez, Elizabeth Char, Tasha Kama, Christine Kishimoto, Dean Rickard and David Ige
Case Number: 1:2021cv00272
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 60 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Proof of service of Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law; Notice of Unacceptable Mail...; Notice Upon the Court re: Correct...; Electronic Service Upon the Court Clerk - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 59 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Correction and Clarification; electronic service upon Court Clerk - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 58 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Notice Unacceptable Mai re: Memorandum A; MOTION to censure Defendant(s); Electronic Service upon Court Clerk - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 56 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re : Notice Upon the Court re: Correct and only form, fashion and method of correct service upon Jeffrey Steven...; Notice Filing is mandatory; Service by electronic mail - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 55 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT: re Notice Unacceptable Mail re: Memorandum A; Motion Upon the Court Cease and Desist - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 54 REPLY to #40 Plaintiff's Motion Upon the Court: Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss File Cause of Action: CV2100272, Filed July 8, 2021 filed by All Members of the Hawaii House of Representative, All Members of the Hawaii Senate, Elizabeth Char, Ronald Couch, Josh Green, David Ige, Christine Kishimoto, Scott Saiki. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Itomura, Lisa) Modified on 8/9/2021 (emt, ).
August 4, 2021 Filing 57 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. #46 Minute Order). Mail sent to Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett, Temporary post location, P. O. Box 623, Kula, HI 96790 returned undelivered, refused. (emt, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 53 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re : Proof of service of Pretrial Conference Statement and Declaration; Proof of Return of Unacceptable mail; Notice - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE UPON THE COURT re : Declaration(s) re : Fault Default in Dishonor; Court Default in Dishonor; Default Upon Oaht and Orders; Decree - Jeffrey Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 51 SUBMISSION(S) STATEMENT re : Scheduling Conference Statement, electronic service upon the Court clerk - by Jeffrey Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 50 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law; electric service upon the Court Clerk - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett.(emt, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 49 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. 41 Minute Order) Mail sent to Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett, Temporary post location, P. O. Box 623, Kula, HI 96790 returned undelivered, refused. (emt, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 48 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. 37 Minute Order). Mail sent to effrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett, Jeffrey-House of Jarrett, Jeffrey S. Jarrett at P. O. Box 623, Kula, HI 96790 returned undelivered, refused. (emt, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 47 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. #34 EO: COURT ORDER: 1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION UPON THE COURT: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY, PREVENTATIVE, PROHIBITORY, QUIA TIMET AND PERPETUAL INJUNCTION; AND 2) RESERVING RULING ON ALL OTHER MATTERS, PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS AND THE JOINDER THEREIN). Mail sent to Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett, Jeffrey-House of Jarrett, Jeffrey S. Jarrett at P. O. Box 623, Kula, HI 96790 returned undelivered, refused. (emt, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 46 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S JULY 18, 2021 FILING AND JULY 21, 2021 FILING [DKT. NOS. #40 AND #43 .]...Docket number #40 is therefore CONSTRUED as Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the State Defendants Motion. The State Defendants' optional reply in support of their motion remains due by August 6, 2021. On July 21, 2021, Plaintiff filed a document titled "Admission(s) Statement re: Notice Unacceptable Mail re: Memorandum A; Motion Upon the Court Cease and Desist" ("Plaintiff's 7/21/21 Motion"). [Dkt. no. #43 .] Plaintiff's 7/21/21 Motion appears to be related to his July 21, 2021 "Notice Upon the Court re: Cease and Desist; Notice of Default; Returned mail." [Dkt. no. #42 .] These documents appear to indicate that there is a dispute regarding the service of documents on Plaintiff. Plaintiff's 7/21/21 Motion is therefore REFERRED to the magistrate judge.(JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 23, 2021 Filing 45 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re #29 Minute Order ). Mail sent to Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett at P. O. Box 623, Kula, HI 96790 returned undelivered, refused. (emt, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 44 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT: re Proof of Service - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 43 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT: re: Notice Unacceptable Mail re: Memorandum A; MOTION Upon the Court Cease and Desist - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE Upon the Court re; Cease and Desist order; Notice of Default; Returned mail - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 41 EO: On 7/16/21, pro se Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett ("Plaintiff") filed a [ECF 39] Motion upon the Court: Extension of Time re: Scheduling Conference Rest Calendar ("Motion"), which the Court construes as a motion to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/21. The Court GRANTS the Motion.The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 8/9/21 at 9:00 a.m. to 10/15/21 at 8:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below: 1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
July 18, 2021 Filing 40 Motion Upon the Court: MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss File Cause of Action: CV2100272, filed July 8, 2021, Electronic Service upon Court Clerk - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION Upon the Court: Extension of Time re: Scheduling Conference Rest Calendar; electronic Service upon Court Clerk - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE UPON THE COURT re: Fraud upon the Court; Contempt of Court; Criminal Acts by the Judge(s), Court Manager(s), Court Clerk(s) and Magistrate(s); Admission(s) Statement Definition; attn: Chief Justice Seabright; electronic service upon the Court Clerk - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 37 EO: On 7/15/21, pro se Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett ("Plaintiff") filed a [ECF #36 ] Motion to Compel Judicial Boundary/Default is Abjuration of the Realm ("Motion"), a two-page document, which even when liberally construed by the Court completely fails to constitute an intelligible pleading.The Motion alleges, in conclusory fashion, that the Court "along with apposing [sic] Council(s) [sic] and Attorney General for State of Hawaii had committed fraud upon the United States District Court District of Hawaii, constituting Criminal Contempt of court" and states that "Jeffrey Steven of the House of Jarrett is not to be coerced, intimidated, abuse [sic], battered, stalked, harassed, or otherwise harmed by any court officer, court clerk(s), any official or any other minions thereof in illegal matter or manor [sic]." Id. The Court is unable to determine what relief is sought and against whom the fraud is alleged, given that the district court is the United States District Court of the District of Hawaii. Further, allegations of fraud are properly brought forth in the Complaint and not in a Motion. The Court also cannot find that a criminal contempt occurred in this civil case. A civil complaint cannot be used to state a claim for the violation of a criminal statute or law. See Aldabe v. Aldabe, 616 F.2d 1089, 1092 (9th Cir. 1980) ("criminal provisions... provide no basis for civil liability"). To the extent Plaintiff has captioned the document as a "motion," the same is DENIED.Plaintiff is reminded that all litigants, including those proceeding pro se, are obligated to follow the Rules. LR1.3. In this case, the Motion does not conform with LR10.2 and is in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(b). Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to follow the rules may result in sanctions, including a fine or dismissal of this case. See LR11.1 & 81.1(a) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(c). (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rls, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 7/16/2021 (rls, ).
July 15, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Compel Judicial Boundary/Default is Abjuration of the Realm - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett (emt, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 35 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT: Proof of Service Memorandum A: Proof of Service Doc; Proof of service File Cause of Action: CV2100272: Admission(s) Statement(s) er: Notice(s) to Void; Affidavit; Motion(s) upon the court...; Service on Court Clerk electronic transmission - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 34 EO: COURT ORDER: 1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION UPON THE COURT: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY, PREVENTATIVE, PROHIBITORY, QUIA TIMET AND PERPETUAL INJUNCTION; AND 2) RESERVING RULING ON ALL OTHER MATTERS, PENDING THE RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS AND THE JOINDER THEREIN (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 12, 2021 Filing 33 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Notice of Default re:Defendants (specific) have failed to respond - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 11, 2021 Filing 32 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Notice Unacceptable Mail re: Memorandum A; Joinder of Defendant per Rule 21 FRCP re #28 - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A)(emt, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Joinder re County Defendants' MEMORANDUM in Support of #30 County Defendants' MOTION for Joinder re #28 State Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss ; Declaration of Iwalani Mountcastle Gasmen; Certificate of Service Iwalani Lehua Mountcastle Gasmen appearing for Defendants Tasha Kama, Keani Rawlins-Fernandez, Dean Rickard, Michael Victorino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Mountcastle Gasmen, Iwalani) Modified on 7/12/2021 to terminate "motion", text modified (emt, ).
July 9, 2021 Filing 30 County Defendants' MOTION for Joinder re #28 State Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Iwalani Lehua Mountcastle Gasmen appearing for Defendants Tasha Kama, Keani Rawlins-Fernandez, Dean Rickard, Michael Victorino (Mountcastle Gasmen, Iwalani) Modified on 7/12/2021 (emt, ).
July 9, 2021 Filing 29 EO: State Defendant's MOTION #28 to Dismiss, will be considered by Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi as a Non Hearing Motion.Response Memorandum is due: 7/23/2021.Optional Reply Memorandum is due: 8/6/2021.State Defendant's MOTION #28 to Dismiss; will be taken under submission thereafter. Court to issue Order. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 8, 2021 Filing 28 State Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Lisa M. Itomura appearing for Defendants Scott Saiki, David Ige, Ronald Couch, Elizabeth Char, All Members of the Hawaii Senate, Christine Kishimoto, Josh Green, All Members of the Hawaii House of Representative (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lisa M. Itomura, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Itomura, Lisa) Modified on 7/9/2021 (emt, ).
July 8, 2021 Filing 27 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT : Declaration of Clarification re: Exact Interpretation; Declaration of Status, Standing and Court Jurisdiction - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 26 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Affidavit of Truth Correction Upon the Court, re: Direction Upon the Court; Directive Upon the Court re: Recusal of Judge(s), Magistrates and Clerk(s); Notice to Clerk of the Court - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 5, 2021 Filing 25 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Affidavit of Truth re: Rights Violation At A Place of Public Accommodation; Motion Upon the Court re: Retention of video and Digital Information for Kahului Costco; Notice to Clerk of the Court - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 24 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Notice to Void COURT ACTION: EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S "FEDERAL CLAIM; EMERGENCY INJUNCTION, AND OTHER RELIEF" filed 06/18/2021 as to Fictitious Case 1:21-cv-00272 LRK-RT for Fraud on it's Face; Notice to Court and Other and All verisimilitudes; Notice to Clerk of the Court, re #16 - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Service by Process to the Court Clerk)(jni)
July 2, 2021 Filing 23 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT re: Notice to Void COURT ACTION: EO: COURT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE NON-HEARING MOTION FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed 06/22/2021 as to Fictitious Case 1:21-cv-00272-LRK-RT For Fraud on it's Face; Notice to Court and Other and All verisimilitudes; Notice to Clerk of the Court, re #19 - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Service by Process to the Court Clerk)(jni)
July 2, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION Upon the Court: Motion for Preliminary, Preventative, Prohibitory, Quia Timet and Perpetual Injunction; Process Service to Court Clerk - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A - State of Hawaii Department of Health Community Bulletin)(jni)
July 2, 2021 Filing 21 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A - Copies of Proof of Service for Ex Parte Non-Hearing Motion; Emergency Injunctive Relief)(jni)
June 29, 2021 Filing 20 ADMISSION(S) STATEMENT - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A - Copies of Proof of Service for Federal Claim; Emergency Injunction, and Other Relief )(emt, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 EO: COURT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE NON-HEARING MOTION FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 Ex-Parte Non-Hearing Motion; Emergency Injunctive Relief - by Plaintiff Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A (Criteria for EUA), #2 Memorandum B (Covid-19 treatment data)(emt, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 Declaration for Ex-Parte Motion re #1 - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarett. (emt, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 16 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S "FEDERAL CLAIM; EMERGENCY INJUNCTION, AND OTHER RELIEF" (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/9/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to David Ige. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Michael Victorino. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Josh Green. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Dean Rickard (identified as "Dean Richards" on the summons). (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Scott Saiki. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ronald Couch. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Christine Kishimoto (identified as "Kristina Kishimoto" on the summons). (emt, ) Modified on 6/15/2021 (emt, ).
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Char. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Keani Rawlins-Fernandez. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tasha Kama. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number HI030782 re #1 Complaint. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT [Federal Claim; Emergency Injunction, and Other Relief] against All Defendants - filed by Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum A - Repudiation and Affidavit of Non-Response, #2 Memorandum B - Authenticated Birth Certificate, #3 Memorandum C - Affidavit of Truth and Assertory Oath, etc., #4 Memorandum D - Notice of Default for Lack of Response to Affidavit of Truth and Assertory Oath, #5 Memorandum E - Data on Deaths in Hawaii due to Covid-19 and Influenza, #6 Memorandum F - Brief on Violation of Article I of the Constitution, #7 Memorandum G - Brief on Continual Retention of Rights and Actions to Proclaim Them, #8 Memorandum H - Brief(s) in Support of this Tort Claim, #9 Memorandum I - Brief on Corruption Within Branches of Federal Government, #10 Memorandum Z - Defendant(s) listed as 1 thru 7 )(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett v. Ige et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey-Steven of the House of Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Victorino
Represented By: Iwalani Lehua Mountcastle Gasmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Members of the Hawaii Senate
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Couch
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Green
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does A-0001 thru Z-9999
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Saiki
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Members of the Hawaii House of Representative
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keani Rawlins-Fernandez
Represented By: Iwalani Lehua Mountcastle Gasmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Char
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Kama
Represented By: Iwalani Lehua Mountcastle Gasmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Kishimoto
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Rickard
Represented By: Iwalani Lehua Mountcastle Gasmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ige
Represented By: Lisa M. Itomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?