Miguel, Jr. v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Miguel, Jr.
Defendant: Doe Government Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Walmart, Inc. and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00276
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (Amended Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories-Kaiser; Hawaiian Properties) (Benton, Shawn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories-Kaiser; Hawaiian Properties) (Benton, Shawn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories-Kaiser; Hawaiian Properties) (Benton, Shawn)
August 5, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin Miguel, Jr. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Response to Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents (Honda, Glenn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Plaintiff's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. (Honda, Glenn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Benjamin Miguel, Jr.. (Honda, Glenn)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on July 20, 2021. (bbb)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 07/18/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 06/07/2022 at 9:45 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 04/13/2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 02/16/2022. Discovery due by 05/20/2022. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Early Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:35 - 9:41) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 EO: The #3 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 07/19/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD will be held via telephone. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. (First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) (Lezy, Normand)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Honda, Glenn)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Joint Report of the Rule 26(f) Conference of the Parties by Benjamin Miguel, Jr.. (Honda, Glenn)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0000640. (emt, )
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/19/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00276 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-21-0000640. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2540362), filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, 1CCV-21-0000640, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial, 1CCV-21-0000640 , #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 6/18/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel, Jr. v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Miguel, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn Tadaomi Honda, Jr.
Represented By: George Cesar Alejandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Government Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Shawn L.M. Benton
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?