Hoffacker v. Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC
Plaintiff: Heidi Hoffacker
Defendant: Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00288
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heidi Hoffacker (Chang, Roy)
August 18, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Incorrect Attorney Filer - Please be advised that Document #15 Certificate of Service filed by Heidi Hoffacker, was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. The filing party shall use its discretion should they feel the necessity to re-submit corrected filings. (emt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Heidi Hoffacker (Demetrakopoulos, Harvey) Modified on 8/18/2021 Document is signed by Roy K. S. Chang, Esq. (emt, ).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/2/2021. (emt, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Mr. Demetrakopoulos reports Plaintiff still treating. Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 12/10/2021 at 8:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code 2070326.Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 11/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Confidential Settlement Conference #2 is set for 8/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by 8/2/2022 to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 12/10/2021 at 08:45 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/8/2022. Discovery due by 9/9/2022. (ATT / 9:10 - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC Re: Defendant Douglas Emmett 2010, LLCs First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Heidi Hoffacker (Hughes, Thomas)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC Re: Defendant Douglas Emmett 2010, LLCs First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Heidi Hoffacker] (Hughes, Thomas)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service. (Hughes, Thomas) Modified on 7/19/2021 (emt, ).
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 Joinder re #7 Report of Planning Meeting DEFENDANT DOUGLAS EMMETT 2010, LLCS JOINDER AND NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF HEIDI HOFFACKERS REPORT OF FRCP 26(F) PLANNING MEETING filed by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC. (Ma, Stacy)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff Heidi Hoffacker's Scheduling Conference Statement Pursuant to L.R. 16(b) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Demetrakopoulos, Harvey) Modified on 7/19/2021 (emt, ).
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiff Heidi Hoffacker's REPORT of FRCP 26(F) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Demetrakopoulos, Harvey) Modified on 7/13/2021 (emt, ).
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0000687. (emt, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/2/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed May 26, 2021; Certificate of Service by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC.(Hughes, Thomas)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00288 LEK-RT on all further pleadings.(jni)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC. (Hughes, Thomas)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 1ccv-21-0000687. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2545379), filed by Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, 1CCV-21-0000687, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hughes, Thomas) Modified on 6/29/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffacker v. Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Emmett 2010, LLC
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Hoffacker
Represented By: Roy K.S. Chang
Represented By: Harvey M. Demetrakopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?