Scutt v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Scutt
Defendant: Maui Community Clinic, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co. and Malama I Ke Ola
Case Number: 1:2021cv00323
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Leighton M. Hara on behalf of Maui Community Clinic on behalf of Maui Community Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hara, Leighton)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 EO: On 9/16/21, Defendant filed [ECF #15 ] Motion for More Definite Statement ("Motion"). On 9/19/21, Plaintiff filed [ECF #16 ] Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement. The Court elects to decide the Motion without a hearing. LR7.1(c). Reply is due 9/30/21. At the upcoming Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/21 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Trader, the Court will discuss a possible stipulation between the parties to permit Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint, in lieu of ruling on the Motion. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
September 20, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Rule 26 DISCLOSURES; Certificate of Service - by Jason Scutt. (emt, )
September 19, 2021 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #15 Defendant's MOTION for More Definite Statement ; Certificate of Service - filed by Jason Scutt. (emt, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement Kallista Namiko Hiraoka appearing for Defendant Maui Community Clinic (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Certificate of Service)(Hiraoka, Kallista)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Scutt. Maui Community Clinic served on 8/27/2021. (emt, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Maui Community Clinic. (emt, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co. (emt, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 Plaintiff's FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Jason Scutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(emt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 Pay.gov Online Payment Re: Filing fee: $ 402, Pay.gov Tracking ID: 26T20VJN re #1 Complaint by Jason Scutt. (emt, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 EO: On 8/4/21, Plaintiff filed an [ECF #8 ] Application for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing ("Application"). Plaintiff's Application is approved. Plaintiff is reminded that he Plaintiff is required to "abide by all local, federal, and other applicable rules and/or statutes." ECF NO. 81.1(a). Any misuse or abuse of e-filing privileges may result in the revocation or termination of permission to participate in electronic filing in this case. Further, failure to abide by the Local Rules may result in sanctions, including but not limited to entry of default judgment or dismissal of this case with prejudice. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/11/2021 (laa).
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-File) (Pro Se Non-Prisoner) - by Plaintiff Jason Scutt. (emt, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Consent to Receive Documents and Notice of Electronic Filings by Email - by Jason Scutt. (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide re: NEFs)(emt, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND (2) DENYING IFP APPLICATION re #1 , #3 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/28/2021. For the reasons stated herein, the Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaint with limited leave to amend and (2) DENIES the IFP Application. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, she must comply with the following requirements: (1) Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is August 18, 2021 ; (2) Plaintiff's amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint"; and (3) Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above and may only amend as directed. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to timely file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order and concurrently remit the filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Jason Scutt served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 28, 2021.
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/27/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Jason Scutt served on July 27, 2021.
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Jason Scutt. (emt, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Jason Scutt. (emt, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 Plaintiff's COMPLAINT and REQUEST for Injunction against All Defendants - filed by Jason Scutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scutt v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maui Community Clinic
Represented By: Kallista Namiko Hiraoka
Represented By: Leighton M. Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malama I Ke Ola
Represented By: Leighton M. Hara
Represented By: Kallista Namiko Hiraoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Scutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?