Roa, et al v. City and County of Honolulu
Plaintiff: Peter Roa and Randall Franklin
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Case Number: 1:2021cv00333
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 EP: EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held. The Court met with the parties. Settlement discussions held. Parties reached a settlement of the attorneys fees portion of this case, subject to City Council approval.Status Conference set for September 22, 2021 is vacated.Stipulation for dismissal due to watson_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by November 17, 2021. (Video Tele-Conference (VTC) - no record 1:30 - 2:30) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 EO: At the request of counsel, an Early Settlement Conference is set for 09/17/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Confidential settlement conference statements are due by 09/10/2021. One double sided hard copy of the Settlement Conference Statements from each party shall be delivered to the Clerk's Office followed by an electronic version to be emailed to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.govThe Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 18, 2021 Filing 17 EO: In light of the #14 Stipulation and Order, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/04/2021 is VACATED. Court sets a Telephonic Status Conference for 09/22/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 EO: Hearing on the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for October 8, 2021 before Judge Derrick K. Watson has been VACATED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 EO: In light of a stipulation reached by the parties and signed by the Court, Dkt. No. 14, the briefing deadlines established at Dkt. No. 10 are hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, Dkt. No. 3, shall by held in abeyance until further order of this Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/16/2021. The parties agree that a non-criminal violation of HRS 711-1101 does not disqualify a person from owning or possessing a firearm under HRS 134-7(b). Therefore, it is stipulated that the Honolulu Police Department is permanently enjoined from denying a permit to acquire a firearm based on a non-criminal violation of 711-1101. (emt, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Roa, Randall Franklin. City and County of Honolulu served on 8/11/2021. (Beck, Alan)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolette Winter on behalf of City and County of Honolulu on behalf of City and County of Honolulu. (Winter, Nicolette)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Kohn on behalf of City and County of Honolulu on behalf of City and County of Honolulu. (Kohn, Robert)
August 8, 2021 Filing 10 EO: On August 4, 2021, Plaintiffs Peter Roa and Randall Franklin filed a motion for preliminary injunction in this case. Dkt. No. 3. The Court sets the following hearing and briefing schedule. A hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction will be held on October 8, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Aha Kupono before Judge Derrick K. Watson. Defendant, City & County of Honolulu, shall respond to the motion for preliminary injunction on or before September 3, 2021. Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before September 17, 2021. In briefing the motion for preliminary injunction, the parties should, among other things, address the following. In the motion, Plaintiffs argue that Defendant's refusal to grant them a firearm permit "is contrary to a plain reading of" Hawaii law and their convictions for disorderly conduct do not qualify as crimes of violence under Hawaii law. Dkt. No. 3-1 at 2. The parties should address whether this Court should certify the foregoing arguments to the Supreme Court of Hawaii pursuant to Hawaii Rule of Appellate Procedure 13. Plaintiffs are instructed to serve a copy of this Entering Order on Defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY by Peter Roa and Randall Chatman Franklin . (O'Grady, Kevin) Modified on 8/9/2021 (emt, ).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/4/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu. (emt, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00333 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan A. Beck on behalf of Peter Roa on behalf of Peter Roa. (Beck, Alan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Kevin Gerard O'Grady appearing for Plaintiff Peter Roa (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Motion for PI, #2 Certificate of Service)(O'Grady, Kevin) Modified on 8/5/2021 (emt, ).
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (O'Grady, Kevin)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Honolulu, City & County of ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2562098.), filed by Peter Roa. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Peter Roa , #2 Verification of Randall Chatman Franklin , #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Civil Cover Sheet )(O'Grady, Kevin) Modified on 8/5/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roa, et al v. City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Roa
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Represented By: Kevin Gerard O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Franklin
Represented By: Alan A. Beck
Represented By: Kevin Gerard O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Represented By: Robert M. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?