Ohana Control Systems, Inc. et al v. City & County of Honolulu et al
Plaintiff: Ohana Control Systems, Inc. and Michael Amir Borochov
Defendant: City & County of Honolulu, Wayne K. Masuda, Sheldon Yasso, Tim Caires, Jeffrey K. Lee, David Malone and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv00345
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 Defendant City and County of Honolulu's MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ; Certificate of Service filed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. (Muzzi, Christopher) Modified on 10/11/2021 (eta).
October 8, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 Defendants Wayne K. Masuda, Sheldon Yasso, Tim Caires, Jeffrey K. Lee and David Malone's MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ; Certificate of Service filed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. (Muzzi, Christopher) Modified on 10/11/2021 (eta).
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 EO: In light of the pending #14 , #15 MOTIONS to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint filed on August 16, 2021, the telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/18/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 12/13/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 12/06/2021. Counsel Nicolette Winter to notify the parties.Given the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings pursuant to the CARES Act due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating criminal matters, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 19 EO: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTIONS: #14 Defendants City and County of Honolulu's Motion to Dismiss Complaint and #15 Defendants Wayne K. Masuda, Sheldon Yasso, Tim Caires, Jeffrey K. Lee, and David Malone's Motion to Dismiss Complaint is SET for hearing before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE at 9:00 AM on 11/19/21. Opposition is due by 10/8/21, reply is due by 10/15/21. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference (VTC). The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court.All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-3207.2. Enter your Access Code (1607265019) The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. (shm)
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 STATEMENT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint filed on August 16, 2021, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint filed on August 16, 2021 (LOCAL RULE 7.8 STATEMENT) filed by Tim Caires, City & County of Honolulu, Jeffrey K. Lee, David Malone, Wayne K. Masuda, Sheldon Yasso. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Nicolette)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 EO: Defendants are directed to file a statement, by 9/15/21, regarding their #14 #15 motions to dismiss in conformance with the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake, which requires counsel for the movant to (1) "include with the motion a statement indicating the date, duration, and communication method of the conference and the participants in the conference" and (2) "detail the issues discussed and resolved during the conference and the issues remaining." (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/9/2021. JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. Please reflect new case number CV 21-00345 JAO -KJM on all further filings . (emt, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint filed on August 16, 2021 Nicolette Winter appearing for Defendants Jeffrey K. Lee, Tim Caires, David Malone, Wayne K. Masuda, Sheldon Yasso (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Nicolette)
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Complaint filed on August 16, 2021 Nicolette Winter appearing for Defendant City & County of Honolulu (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Nicolette)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. Jeffrey K. Lee served on 8/17/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. Tim Caires served on 8/17/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. Sheldon Yasso served on 8/17/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. City & County of Honolulu served on 8/17/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. David Malone served on 8/18/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. Wayne K. Masuda served on 8/18/2021. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/18/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00345 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Muzzi, Christopher)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2566150.), filed by Ohana Control Systems, Inc., and Michael Amir Borochov, Ohana Control Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muzzi, Christopher) Modified on 8/16/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohana Control Systems, Inc. et al v. City & County of Honolulu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohana Control Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Represented By: Leila M Rothwell Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Amir Borochov
Represented By: Leila M Rothwell Sullivan
Represented By: Christopher J. Muzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of Honolulu
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne K. Masuda
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Yasso
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Caires
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K. Lee
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Malone
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?