Privratsky v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shawn D. Privratsky
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00390
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara Sayuri Nakagawa on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Nakagawa, Dara)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company's Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service . (Ando, Nadine) Modified on 11/8/2021 (eta).
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff Shawn D. Privratsky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Ando, Nadine)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED OCTOBER 12, 2021; ORDER re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 10/20/2021. Attorney Nadine Y. Ando for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company added. (eta)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company re #9 . (eta)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default by Shawn D. Privratsky. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Supplement [Proposed] Entry of Default Against Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company)(Eyerly, Tred)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DANIEL K. REISING re #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 10/6/2021. (eta)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, 2 Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Set Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, Acknowledgement filed by Shawn D. Privratsky. (Eyerly, Tred)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel Reising Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2580711.Tred R. Eyerly appearing for Plaintiff Shawn D. Privratsky (Eyerly, Tred)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (jni)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00390 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2580387.), filed by Shawn D. Privratsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Supplement Jury Demand, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eyerly, Tred) Docket Text Modified on 9/16/2021 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Privratsky v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn D. Privratsky
Represented By: Tred R. Eyerly
Represented By: Daniel K. Reising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Nadine Y. Ando
Represented By: Dara Sayuri Nakagawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?