Dubin v. Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court et al
Plaintiff: Gary Victor Dubin
Defendant: Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court, Bradley R. Tamm and Clifford L. Nakea
Case Number: 1:2021cv00392
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 19 Attorney Appeal Packet re #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Victor Dubin, USCA NO. 21-16839. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Due Process Appeal, #2 Instructions for Civil Appeal (no hearings held), #3 Docket Sheet)(eta)
November 2, 2021 Filing 18 USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Victor Dubin, USCA NO. 21-16839. (eta)
November 2, 2021 Filing 17 USCA Case Number 21-16839 for #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gary Victor Dubin. (eta)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith M. Kiuchi on behalf of Gary Victor Dubin on behalf of Gary Victor Dubin. (Kiuchi, Keith)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DUE PROCESS APPEAL to the Ninth Circuit Court Appeals in Civil No. 21-00392; Exhibits 1 and 2; Certificate of Service by Gary Victor Dubin. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0975-2599450. USCA NO. 21-16839. (Kiuchi, Keith) Modified on 11/1/2021 (eta). Modified on 11/2/2021 (eta).
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 10/13/2021 pursuant to ECF No. #13 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. (eta)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/13/2021. (eta)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/22/2021. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. JUDGE ALAN C. KAY no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 21-00392 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings . (emt, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 21-00392 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #4 Memo: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00392 KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Gary Victor Dubin. (Dubin, Gary)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Dubin, Gary)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT to Directly Set Aside the Hawaii State Supreme Court's Order Disbarring Plaintiff in Violation of the Due Process Fair Hearing Guaranty of the Fifth and Fourteenth Amendments to the United States Constitution Resulting from the Defendants Having Committed Extrinsic Fraud in its Procurement, and for Actual and Punitive Civil Rights Damages Against the Individual Defendants Involved against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2581635.), filed by Gary Victor Dubin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Supplement Jury Trial Demand, #6 Supplement Summons)(Dubin, Gary) Docket Text Modified on 9/20/2021 (jni)
September 20, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY-Incorrect Attachment-Please be advised that an incorrect document was attached during filing, re #5 . The correct document has been re-attached and the NEF will be regenerated. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubin v. Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Victor Dubin
Represented By: Gary Victor Dubin
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Disciplinary Counsel of the Hawaii Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley R. Tamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford L. Nakea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?