Malori v. Oahu Community Correctional Center (OCCC) et al
Plaintiff: Roberta Malori
Defendant: Oahu Community Correctional Center (OCCC), Honolulu Police Department (HPD), Queen's Medical Center and ACO Tiffany LNU
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2021cv00420
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 15 EO: Before the Court is a filing requesting a one-month extension [ECF No. #11 ]. The filing was signed and submitted by someone who describes himself as Plaintiffs "common-law" spouse. Rule 11(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure states, however, that "[e]very... written motion... must be signed by... a party personally if the party is unrepresented." Plaintiff is representing herself in this action, but she did not sign this filing. Thus, the Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE the extension request.At all events, the latest extension request is moot because the court granted Plaintiffs "Request Extension of Time to the Order Dismissing Various Filing with Leave Granted to Amend by December 17, 2021" [ECF No. #9 ], on December 10, 2021 [ECF No. #10 ]. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue her claims, she must file an amended pleading on or before January 18, 2022. Failure to file an amended pleading may result in automatic dismissal of this suit without further notice, and Plaintiff may incur a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Alternatively, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss her action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), and such a dismissal will not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
December 17, 2021 Filing 14 WITHDRAWAL of Document re: #13 Notice of Dismissal - filed by Roberta Malori (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
December 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal - by Roberta Malori (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST for an Extension for a Later Time the Due Date 12-17-2021; REQUEST to Mail Send to Me Another Blank Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Including a Copies of All Entire Court Records - by Plaintiff Roberta Malori (Attachments: #1 Additional Information, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (re ECF No. #8 Order Dismissing Various Filings With Leave Granted to Amend) - by Non-Party Alfred W. K. Chun on Behalf of Plaintiff Roberta Malori. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2021: #2 (unredacted) Motion for Extension) (eta).
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 EO: Before the court is Plaintiffs "Request Extension of Time to the Order Dismissing Various Filings with Leave Granted to Amend by December 17, 2021" [ECF No. #9 ]. Plaintiff requests an extension of 30 days or longer. The Motion is GRANTED in part. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue her claims, she must file an amended pleading on or before January 18, 2022. In the event she chooses to amend, Plaintiff should consider the courts guidance in its November 17, 2021 Order Dismissing Various Filings with Leave Granted to Amend [ECF No. 8]. Failure to file an amended pleading may result in automatic dismissal of this suit without further notice, and Plaintiff may incur a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Alternatively, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss her action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), and such a dismissal will not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff another blank civil rights complaint form. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
December 10, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #10 Minute Order has been served by First Class Mail to Roberta Malori at the address of record on December 10, 2021. A blank prisoner civil rights complaint form was included in the mailing to Plaintiff. (eta)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST Extension of Time [to the #8 Order Dismissing Various Filings With Leave Granted to Amend by December 17, 2021] (and Request for another blank "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint" form) - by Plaintiff Roberta Malori (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING VARIOUS FILINGS WITH LEAVE GRANTED TO AMEND re #1 . #3 , #4 ], #5 , #7 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/17/2021. (1) Malori's "Complaint of use wrong identities information," ECF No. 1, "Civil Rights Complaint for Prisoner," ECF No. 3-1, "Civil Rights Complaint for prisoner-request injunction," ECF No. 3-2, "Civil Right Complaint for prisoner with injunction," ECF No. 4, "Civil Right Complaint for prisoner an injunction," ECF No. 5, and "Civil Right complaint against inhuman treatment and torture against Prisoner Civil Right complaint against racial, discrimination disability, hate crime, intolerance by ACO Tiffany violation of human rights, Civil Rights Complaint for Prison requesting protection from retaliatory acts by ACO Tiffany and other's," ECF No. 7, are DISMISSED with leave granted to amend. (2) Malori's "Motion to Combined," ECF No. 3, is DENIED. (3) If Malori decides to pursue any of her claims, she must file an amended complaint that addresses the noted deficiencies in her claims on or before December 17, 2021. (4) Failure to timely file an amended pleading may result in AUTOMATIC DISMISSAL of this suit without further notice, and Malori may incur a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). ALTERNATIVELY, Malori may voluntarily dismiss her action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), and such a dismissal will not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Roberta Malori served by First Class Mail to the addresse of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 17, 2021. A blank prisoner civil rights complaint form shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff.
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Rights COMPLAINT Against Inhuman Treatment and Torture Against Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Against Racial, Discrimination, Disability, Hate Crime, Intolerance against Oahu Community Correctional Center (OCCC), ACO Tiffany LNU - filed by Roberta Malori. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta) Modified on 11/9/2021 This document is unsigned (eta).
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number HI031574 re #1 Complaint (eta)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 "Civil Right Complaint for Prisoner an Injunction" re #3 - by Roberta Malori. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 "Civil Right Complaint for Prisoner with Injunction" re #3 - by Roberta Malori. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Combined - by Plaintiff Roberta Malori (Attachments: #1 "Civil Rights Complaint for Prisoner", #2 "Civil Rights Complaint for Prisoner - Request Injunction", #3 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/21/2021. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Roberta Malori (also known as "Roberta Wilborn") served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 25, 2021. A blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions were included in the mailing to Plaintiff.
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Request of Injunction against All Defendants - filed by Roberta Malori. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malori v. Oahu Community Correctional Center (OCCC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Malori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oahu Community Correctional Center (OCCC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu Police Department (HPD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen's Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACO Tiffany LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?