The North River Insurance Company v. Windward Auto Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: North River Insurance Company, The
Defendant: Windward Auto Sales, Inc.
Counter Defendant: North River Insurance Company (The), John Does 1-20, Jane Does 1-20, Doe Entities 1-20 and Doe Insurance Entities 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv00424
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff The North River Insurance Company's ANSWER to #10 Defendant Windward Auto Sales, Inc.'s Counterclaim, Filed December 13, 2021 by North River Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 12/22/2021 (eta).
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 EO: Pursuant to Defense Counsel's request and no objection by Plaintiff's Counsel, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2021 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is CONTINUED to 1/27/2022 at 08:30AM. Scheduling Conference Statements must be filed by 1/20/2022.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rlfh)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K. Kau on behalf of Windward Auto Sales, Inc. on behalf of Windward Auto Sales, Inc.. (Kau, Megan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Monika M. Wurlitzer on behalf of Windward Auto Sales, Inc. on behalf of Windward Auto Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wurlitzer, Monika)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windward Auto Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Andres, Tristan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Filed October 26, 2021, COUNTERCLAIM ; Exhibits "A" and "B"; Demand For Jury Trial; Certificate of Service against All Defendants North River Insurance Company, (The), John Does 1-20, Jane Does 1-20, Doe Entities 1-20, and Doe Insurance Entities 1-20 by Windward Auto Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Demand for Jury Trial, #5 Certificate of Service)(Andres, Tristan) Modified on 12/14/2021 (eta).
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by North River Insurance Company, The. Windward Auto Sales, Inc. served on 10/29/2021. (Shibuya, Ashley)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Windward Auto Sales, Inc. (jo)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jo)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 12/27/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 21-00424 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The North River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited (Canada), Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Company for The North River Insurance Company.. (Shibuya, Ashley)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Shibuya, Ashley)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Windward Auto Sales, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2598097.), filed by The North River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shibuya, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The North River Insurance Company v. Windward Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North River Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windward Auto Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Megan K. Kau
Represented By: Monika M. Wurlitzer
Represented By: Tristan S.D. Andres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: North River Insurance Company (The)
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Doe Insurance Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?