LGJ, LLC v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Plaintiff: LGJ, LLC
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company, John and Jane Does 1-20, Doe Partnerships 1-20, Doe Corporations 1-20, Doe Governmental Entities 1-20 and Doe Entities 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv00459
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 Return of Service on Subpoena Denise Koehu, President was served on 1/20/2022 (Leong, Kurt)
January 20, 2022 ADVISORY ENTRY. Discovery - Re: Document #15 Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Questions filed by LGJ. LLC ~ The filing party may refer to Fed.R.Civ.P.5(d) governing the filing procedures for the filing of discovery. A certificate of service may be filed to indicate that discovery has been exchanged. No further action is necessary. (eta)
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by LGJ, LLC of Taking Deposition Upon Written Questions LGJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Certificate of Service)(Leong, Kurt)
January 4, 2022 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0001053. (eta)
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LGJ, LLC (Re: Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Stewart Title Guaranty Company, dated January 4, 2022) (Ogawa, Roy)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 12/27/2021. (jo)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had regarding status of partition action pending in state court. Parties exploring whether possible to resolve case based upon cross-motions for summary judgment. Parties amenable global settlement discussions. Court sets Telephone Conference for 4/22/2022 at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:<<. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Enter Access Code 2070326.Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 3/28/2023 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/14/2023 at 10:00 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference statements due by 1/3/2023. Telephone Conference is set for 4/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/26/2022. Discovery due by 1/27/2023. Other Matters: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake available on the court's website.(ATT / 9:00 - 9:07 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) Modified on 12/27/2021 (jp).
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LGJ, LLC. (Leong, Kurt)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Leong, Kurt) Modified on 12/21/2021 (eta).
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Leong, Kurt) Modified on 12/21/2021 (eta).
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant Stewart Title Guaranty Company's Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Comeau, Michelle) Modified on 12/21/2021 (eta).
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/27/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00459 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (eta)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Comeau, Michelle)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stewart Title Guaranty Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Comeau, Michelle) Modified on 11/23/2021 (eta).
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stewart Title Guaranty Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2612776), filed by Stewart Title Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michelle N. Comeau, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint - 1CCV-21-0001053) , #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Comeau, Michelle) Modified on 11/23/2021 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LGJ, LLC v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LGJ, LLC
Represented By: Kurt K. Leong
Represented By: Roy T. Ogawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Jade L. Ching
Represented By: Michelle N. Comeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?