O'Hailpin v. Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Riki O'Hailpin, Nina Arizumi, Robert Espinosa, Erwin Young, Puanani Badiang, Sabrina Franks and Ronald Lum
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00007
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 65 Costs Taxed in amount of $330.84 against Plaintiffs. (jni)
April 14, 2022 Filing 64 Attorney Appeal Packet re #61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sabrina Franks, Puanani Badiang, Ronald Lum, Erwin Young, Robert Espinosa, Nina Arizumi, Riki O'Hailpin (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 District Court Instructions for Civil Appeals, #3 Docket Sheet); USCA NO. 22-15558 (jni)
April 14, 2022 Filing 63 USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to #61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sabrina Franks, Puanani Badiang, Ronald Lum, Erwin Young, Robert Espinosa, Nina Arizumi, Riki O'Hailpin (Attachments: #1 Notice to all Parties and Counsel, #2 Mediation Letter); USCA NO. 22-15558 (jni)
April 14, 2022 Filing 62 USCA Case Number 22-15558 for #61 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sabrina Franks, Puanani Badiang, Ronald Lum, Erwin Young, Robert Espinosa, Nina Arizumi, Riki O'Hailpin. (jni)
April 13, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #57 ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 47 , 48 and #58 Clerk's Judgment by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AHIDC-2667634. Appeal Record due by 4/14/2022. (Hochberg, Lloyd); USCA NO. 22-15558 Modified on 4/13/2022 (jo) Docket Text Modified on 4/14/2022 (jni)
April 1, 2022 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings MOTIONS via Video Teleconference held on March 11, 2022, before Judge Jill A. Otake. Court Reporter/Transcriber - ANN MATSUMOTO, Telephone number - 8085412061, Email Address - am@hid.uscourts.gov. PP. - 28 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 4/19/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2022. (Matsumoto, Ann)
April 1, 2022 Filing 59 BILL OF COSTS by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Invoice 20220002 re: 2-1-22 Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Transcript and Invoice 20220011 re: 3-11-22 Transcript)(Rhee, John)
March 18, 2022 Filing 58 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/18/2022 pursuant to ECF No. #57 ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. (eta)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STAY OF DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re #47 , #48 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/18/2022. Excerpt of Order: Because Plaintiffs failed to exhaust their administrative remedies, the case must be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Dismissal is without prejudice to refiling a new action once administrative remedies are exhausted. For the reasons stated herein, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay, ECF No. 48, and GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 47. (eta)
March 11, 2022 Filing 56 EP: Hearing on #47 Defendants Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' #48 Motion for Stay of District Court Proceeding Pending Interlocutory Appeal was conducted by video teleconference (VTC).Plaintiff Client Representatives Riki O'Hailpin, Robert Espinosa, Erwin Young, Ron Lum, Sabrina Franks and Nina Arizumi participated by VTC.Client Representative Marguerite Fujie for Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. also participated by VTC. #47 Defendants Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs' #48 Motion for Stay of District Court Proceeding Pending Interlocutory Appeal - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court to issue a written order.(Reporter-Ann Matsumoto) (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
March 8, 2022 Filing 55 EO: At the hearing on #47 Defendants Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss; and Plaintiffs' #48 Motion for Stay of District Court Proceeding Pending Interlocutory Appeal, the Court will allow both sides 15 minutes for argument (including rebuttal). Defendants will proceed first with their motion and response to Plaintiffs' motion. Plaintiffs will then proceed with their motion and response to Defendants' motion. The Court will allow rebuttal thereafter. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(rls)
March 4, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE OF HEARING MOTIONS: #47 Defendants Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss; and Plaintiffs' #48 Motion for Stay of District Court Proceeding Pending Interlocutory Appeal is SET for hearing before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE at 1:00 PM on 3/11/22. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference (VTC). The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court. All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-3207.2. Enter your Access Code (1607265019) Requests for video access to VTC hearings by anyone who is not a party or attorney for a party must be emailed to otake_orders@hid.uscourts.gov, no later than 24 hours before the hearing. Any request received after this deadline will be automatically denied. Those granted access: (1) must timely log on and mute audio and video and during the proceeding; and (2) are prohibited from: (a) engaging in disruptive behavior, (b) sharing the login information with anyone, and (c) recording the hearing in any fashion. Failure to abide by these rules may result in expulsion from the hearing and/or the imposition of sanctions. (shm)
March 2, 2022 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Stay of District Court Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nickolas A. Kacprowski, #2 Exhibit 1 (Transcript of Proceedings held on February 1, 2022), #3 Exhibit 2 (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction), #4 Exhibit 3 (Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction), #5 Exhibit 4 (Opinion & Order))(Kacprowski, Nickolas) Modified on 3/4/2022 (eta).
March 2, 2022 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition To Motion To Dismiss [Dkt #47 ] filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. (Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 3/4/2022 (eta).
February 18, 2022 Filing 51 EO: In light of the #49 Stipulation and Order, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for March 7, 2022 IS CONTINUED TO May 6, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by April 29, 2022.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 50 EO: The parties are to file responses to #47 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and #48 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by 3/2/22. Replies are not allowed. The Court will determine whether hearings are necessary after reviewing the briefing. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 2/17/2022. (eta)
February 16, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION to Stay Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr appearing for Plaintiffs Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Certification of Pre-Filing Conference)(Hochberg, Lloyd)
February 16, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim John S. Rhee appearing for Defendants Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Rule 7.8 Certification)(Rhee, John)
February 15, 2022 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT of Proceeding via Video Teleconference re: Application for TRO and OSC Prelim. Injunct./Application to Strike Decl. Frederick Reed Bates II, etc. held on February 1, 2022, before Judge Jill A. Otake. Court Reporter/Transcriber - ANN MATSUMOTO, Telephone number - 8085412061,Email Address - am@hid.uscourts.gov. PP. - 42 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 3/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2022. (Matsumoto, Ann)
February 15, 2022 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT Designation and Ordering Form by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young for proceedings held on 2/1/2022 before Judge Jill A. Otake, re #42 USCA Case Number, #41 Notice of Appeal,, #43 Attorney Appeal Packet, Transcript due by 2/18/2022. (Hochberg, Lloyd)
February 14, 2022 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT Designation and Ordering Form by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young for proceedings held on 2/1/2022 before Judge Jill A. Otake, re #42 USCA Case Number, #41 Notice of Appeal,, #43 Attorney Appeal Packet, Transcript due by 2/17/2022. (Hochberg, Lloyd)
February 14, 2022 Filing 43 Attorney Appeal Packet re #41 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young, USCA NO. 22-15215. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Preliminary Injunction Appeal, #2 Instructions for Civil Appeals, #3 Additional Instructions for Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, #4 Letter Re: Court Reporters, #5 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, #6 Docket Sheet)(eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 42 USCA Case Number 22-15215 for #41 Notice of Appeal, filed by Sabrina Franks, Puanani Badiang, Ronald Lum, Erwin Young, Robert Espinosa, Nina Arizumi, Riki O'Hailpin. Briefing schedule will be set by future court order. (eta)
February 11, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL as to #40 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for TRO, by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AHIDC-2642520. Appeal Record due by 3/4/2022. USCA NO. 22-15215 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 2/14/2022 (eta). Modified on 2/14/2022 (eta).
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE AND (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF FREDERICK REED BATES, II re #17 , #36 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/2/2022. (eta)
February 1, 2022 Filing 39 EP: Hearing on #17 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue and #36 Defendants' Application to Strike Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II, Attached to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction was conducted by video teleconference (VTC).Plaintiff Client Representatives Riki O'Hailpin, Robert Espinosa, Erwin Young, Puanani Badiang, Sabrina Franks and Nina Arizumi participated by VTC.Client Representative Marguerite Fujie for Defendant Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. also participated by VTC. #17 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. #36 Defendants' Application to Strike Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II, Attached to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court to issue a written order.(Reporter-Ann Matsumoto) (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 31, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #36 Defendants' Application to Strike Declaration to Strike Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II, Attached to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is SET for hearing before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE at 9:00 AM on 2/1/22. Plaintiffs may respond at the hearing. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference (VTC). The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court. All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-3207.2. Enter your Access Code (1607265019) The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. (shm) Modified on 1/31/2022 (shm).
January 31, 2022 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. (Hochberg, Lloyd)
January 28, 2022 Filing 36 Defendants' APPLICATION to Strike Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II Attached to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Application re #33 Reply filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. and Hawaiian Holdings, Inc . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nickolas A. Kacprowski, #2 Exhibit 1 - 1/26/2022 Hochberg Emails, #3 Exhibit 2 - Bates Declaration, #4 [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Application to Strike Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II Attached to Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Kacprowski, Nickolas) Filing event modified on 1/31/2022 to reflect as "motion to strike" (eta).
January 28, 2022 Filing 35 EO: At the hearing on Plaintiffs' #17 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue, the Court will allow Plaintiffs 25 minutes for argument (including rebuttal) and Defendants 25 minutes for argument. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 25, 2022 Filing 34 STATEMENT Certificate of Compliance LR 7.4 re #33 filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. (Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 1/26/2022 (eta).
January 25, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #17 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re #31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF FREDERICK REED BATES, II , #2 Exhibit 1 , #3 Certificate of Service)(Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 1/26/2022 (eta). Modified on 2/2/2022 The Declaration of Frederick Reed Bates, II pursuant to ECF No. #40 (eta).
January 21, 2022 Filing 32 AMENDED DOCUMENT (Amended Certificate of Word Count to #31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion) by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. (Kacprowski, Nickolas) Modified on 1/24/2022 (eta).
January 21, 2022 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Kobayashi, #2 Declaration of Nickolas A. Kacprowski, #3 Exhibit 1 - Article Titled "Covid-19 vaccine is high priority for cardiac patients", #4 Exhibit 2 - Article Titled "United CEO: 4% of U.S. Workforce test positive.. ", #5 Exhibit 3 - Article Titled "The Possibility of COVID-19 after Vaccination... ", #6 Exhibit 4 - CDC's "COVID Data Tracker", #7 Exhibit 5 - CDC's "COVID Data Tracker", #8 Exhibit 6 - Article "Benefits of Getting a COVID-19 Vaccine", #9 Exhibit 7 - Article "Omicron Variant... ", #10 Certificate of Word Count)(Kacprowski, Nickolas)
January 19, 2022 Filing 30 EO: On 1/18/22, Defendants filed a #29 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum Exceeding Word Limit, requesting permission to include an additional 2,750 words in their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART the Motion. Defendant may exceed the word limit by 2,000 words. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 18, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum Exceeding Word Limit John S. Rhee appearing for Defendants Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Rhee)(Rhee, John)
January 14, 2022 Filing 28 EO: Hearing on #17 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue is SET for hearing on 2/1/22 at 9:00 AM before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference (VTC). The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court. All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-3207.2. Enter your Access Code (1607265019) The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. (shm)
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 EP: EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held. The Court met with the parties. Settlement discussions held.No resolution of the TRO reached. Counsel may contact the magistrate judge directly at any point if they would like to further discuss settlement. (Video Tele-Conference (VTC) No Record - 1:30 - 1:45) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 26 EO: Early Settlement Conference is set for January 14, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Separate statements/letter are not needed at this time unless parties would like to provide the Court with one, limited to the issue of whether any of the requested TRO relief might be agreed to, which shall be email to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 25 EO: The briefing schedule for #17 Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause why Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue is as follows: Opposition due by 5:00 p.m. on 1/21/22, reply due by noon on 1/25/22. The Court will determine the hearing date after the parties' settlement discussions with Magistrate Judge Mansfield. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 13, 2022 Filing 24 EP: Status Conference was conducted telephonically. Discussion held re: pending Application for Temporary Restraining Order and other potential motions.Parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield for settlement discussion. (Reporter-Cynthia Fazio) (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 12, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Nickolas A. Kacprowski on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Kacprowski, Nickolas)
January 12, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Rhee on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Rhee, John)
January 12, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Corianne W. Lau on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Lau, Corianne)
January 12, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. for Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc... (Alston, Paul)
January 12, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alston on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. on behalf of Hawaiian Airlines, Inc., Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.. (Alston, Paul)
January 10, 2022 Filing 18 EO: A Status Conference is SET for 1/13/22 at 11:00 AM before DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant about the status conference.Pursuant to the August 17, 2021 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Pandemic, the hearing will be conducted telephonically using AT&T Connect Audio Conference. Instructions for telephonic appearance are as follows: All participants must connect to the conference at least ten minutes before the scheduled start time for the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court. All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion.PARTICIPANT INSTRUCTIONS:1. Dial 1-888-636-3807.2. Enter your Access Code (1450662). Any parties or members of the public or media wishing to attend the hearing by telephone conference shall also follow the Participant Instructions. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 10, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Application for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue ] Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr appearing for Plaintiffs Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support , #2 Declaration of James Hochberg, Esq., #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Conference, #5 Certificate of Service on Marguerite Fujii, Esq.)(Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 1/11/2022 (eta).
January 8, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. on 1/7/2022 - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and affiliated documents served on Steven Magallon for Corporation Service Company on January 7, 2022, filed by Erwin Young. (Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 1/10/2022 (eta).
January 8, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. on 1/7/2022 - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and affiliated documents served on Steven Magallon for Corporation Service Company on January 7, 2022, filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin, Erwin Young. (Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 1/10/2022 (eta).
January 8, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. on 1/7/2022 - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and affiliated documents served on Steven Magallon for Corporation Service Company on January 7, 2022, filed by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin. (Hochberg, Lloyd) Modified on 1/10/2022 (eta).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOHN C. SULLIVAN re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 1/7/2022. (eta)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Hawaiian Holdings, Inc. (eta)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Hawaiian Airlines, Inc. (eta)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 7, 2022 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice John C. Sullivan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2627121., requires the court's approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address (mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov). The filing party may also refer to Section 10.4 of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (eta)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Hochberg, Lloyd)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice John C. Sullivan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2627121.Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr appearing for Plaintiffs Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin (Hochberg, Lloyd)
January 6, 2022 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Hochberg, Lloyd)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1. Disclosure Statement by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin re #1 Complaint . (Hochberg, Lloyd) Text modified on 1/7/2022 (eta).
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Nina Arizumi, Puanani Badiang, Robert Espinosa, Sabrina Franks, Ronald Lum, Riki O'Hailpin. (Hochberg, Lloyd)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 3/7/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00007 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 Class Action Verified COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2626879.), filed by Riki O'Hailpin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nina Arizumi, #2 Declaration of Puanani Badiang, #3 Declaration of Sabrina Franks, #4 Declaration of Robert Espinosa, #5 Declaration of Ronald Lum, #6 Declaration of Riki O'Hailpin, #7 Declaration of Erwin Young)(Hochberg, Lloyd) Docket Text Modified on 1/6/2022 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Hailpin v. Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riki O'Hailpin
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Arizumi
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Espinosa
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erwin Young
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puanani Badiang
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Franks
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lum
Represented By: John C. Sullivan
Represented By: Lloyd James Hochberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Corianne W. Lau
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Corianne W. Lau
Represented By: John S. Rhee
Represented By: Nickolas A. Kacprowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?