Taylor et al v. City and County of Honolulu et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Taylor and N. B.
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu, Hawaii State Department of Education, C. Neves, C. Perez, Ford, Terri Runge, HPD Defendants 1-10, DOE-HI Defendants 1-10, Christine Neves, Corey Perez and Warren Ford
Case Number: 1:2022cv00013
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against City and County of Honolulu, DOE-HI Defendants 1-10, Warren Ford, HPD Defendants 1-10, Hawaii State Department of Education, C. Christine Neves, C. Corey Perez, Terri Runge, filed by N. B., Tamara Taylor.(Caballero, Mateo) Modified on 3/7/2022 (jo)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 EO: For good cause shown, and given the lack of any opposition, the Court GRANTS #18 Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct Names of Parties in the Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint by 03/10/2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 03/07/2022. (kjm2)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Names of Parties in the Complaint Mateo Caballero appearing for Plaintiffs N. B., Tamara Taylor (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mateo Caballero, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Caballero, Mateo)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William R.K. Awong on behalf of Hawaii State Department of Education on behalf of Hawaii State Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Awong, William)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 EO: In light of the #15 Letter of request from counsel Mateo Caballero, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for March 7, 2022 IS CONTINUED TO May 6, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by April 29, 2022.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER from Mateo Caballero requesting a 60-day continuance of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (bbb)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting under FRCP Rule 26(f). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Caballero, Mateo)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by N. B., Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Caballero, Mateo)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek T. Mayeshiro on behalf of City and County of Honolulu on behalf of City and County of Honolulu. (Mayeshiro, Derek)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by City and County of Honolulu. (Mayeshiro, Derek)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Hawaii State Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Awong, William)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N. B., Tamara Taylor. Hawaii State Department of Education served on 1/24/2022 1/14/2022. (Caballero, Mateo) Modified on 1/27/2022 (jo)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N. B., Tamara Taylor. City and County of Honolulu served on 1/14/2022. (Caballero, Mateo)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 3/7/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00013 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Caballero, Mateo)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Caballero, Mateo)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2627685.), filed by N. B., Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caballero, Mateo) Modified on 1/7/2022 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. City and County of Honolulu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Taylor
Represented By: Mateo Caballero
Represented By: Jongwook Philip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. B.
Represented By: Mateo Caballero
Represented By: Jongwook Philip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Derek T. Mayeshiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii State Department of Education
Represented By: William R.K. Awong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Neves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Runge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPD Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE-HI Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Neves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?