Kurotaki v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Osamu Kurotaki
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2022cv00063
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 26 EO: Because Defendant United States of America has been granted additional time to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 5/16/2022 to 6/13/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re: #24 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/11/2022. United States of America answer due 5/26/2022 (jo)
April 11, 2022 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Jeremy N. Hendon appearing for Defendant United States of America (Hendon, Jeremy)
March 30, 2022 Filing 23 EO: At Plaintiff's request, and because Defendants have not yet appeared in this action, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 4/11/2022 to 5/16/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall inform Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO GARY H. KUWADA re: #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/22/2022. GARY H. KUWADA, ESQ. (Firm: Gary H. Kuwada, APC) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Plaintiff Osamu Kurotaki (jo)
February 18, 2022 Filing 21 Supplemental Declaration re 20 Link, SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GARY H. KUWADA. (Chang, Howard)
February 15, 2022 Filing 20 EO: As to #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Gary H. Kuwada), Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a supplemental declaration detailing under what circumstances Mr. Kuwada was subject to a disciplinary proceeding before the State Bar of California, see ECF No. 8 at 2, in compliance with Local Rule 83.1(c)(2)(B)(iv). (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEVEN R. MATHER re: #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/15/2022. STEVEN R. MATHER, ESQ. (Firm: Mather Anderson) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Plaintiff (jo)
February 14, 2022 Filing 18 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/11/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Treasury. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to United States of America [Civil Process Clerk]. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service [Chief Counsel, Internal Revenue Service]. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to United States of America [Attorney General of the United States] (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to United States of America [ Assistant Attorney General for Administration]. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00063 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Steven R. Mather) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2643153.Howard T. Chang appearing for Plaintiff Osamu Kurotaki (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Gary H. Kuwada) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2643145.Howard T. Chang appearing for Plaintiff Osamu Kurotaki (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Chang, Howard)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2643110.), filed by Osamu Kurotaki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44))(Chang, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurotaki v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osamu Kurotaki
Represented By: Howard T. Chang
Represented By: Gary H. Kuwada
Represented By: Steven R. Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy N. Hendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?