Lasham v. Grimes et al
Plaintiff: Tara Lasham
Defendant: Jason Grimes, Gerald W. Scatena, Bruce Larson and State of Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2022cv00098
Filed: March 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2022 Filing 49 Scheduling Conference Statement by Gerald W. Scatena. (Scatena, Gerald)
May 8, 2022 Filing 48 Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service by Gerald W. Scatena. (Scatena, Gerald) Modified on 5/9/2022 COS is unsigned (eta).
May 4, 2022 Filing 47 EO: In light of the pending #23 , #6 , #36 , #45 , #33 and #27 Motions the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for May 9, 2022 IS CONTINUED TO June 8, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. TO BE HELD IN COURTROOM 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by June 1, 2022. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
May 1, 2022 Filing 46 Scheduling Conference Statement by State of Hawaii. (Nugent, Mark)
April 28, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Amend Pleadings FRCP Pursuant to FRCP Rule 15(a)(2) - by Plaintiff Tara Lasham (Attachments: #1 Notice to Clerk of Family Court Re: Notice of Mstake, FCP 17-1-098 K)(eta)
April 26, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Wayne Scatena on behalf of Gerald W. Scatena on behalf of Gerald W. Scatena. (Scatena, Gerald)
April 26, 2022 Filing 43 EO: On April 22, 2022, Defendant Gerald W. Scatena filed a motion to dismiss. Dkt. No. 36. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Scatena's motion to dismiss: Plaintiff Tara Lasham's response shall be due on or before May 2, 2022; Scatena's reply, if any, shall be due on or before May 9, 2022. Should a hearing be necessary after briefing on the motion to dismiss, the Court will enter an appropriate order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 26, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the Court's EO, Dkt. No. 43, has been served by First Class Mail to Gerald W. Scatena, Jason Grimes and Tara Lasham at the addresses of record on April 26, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
April 25, 2022 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bruce Larson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Word Limitations, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Robyn)
April 25, 2022 Filing 41 Defendant Jason Grimes MEMORANDUM in Support for #27 Defendant State of Hawaii MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction - filed by Jason Grimes. (eta)
April 25, 2022 Filing 40 Defendant Jason Grimes MEMORANDUM in Support for #33 Defendant the Honorable Bruce Larson MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Jason Grimes. (eta)
April 25, 2022 Filing 39 Defendant Jason Grimes MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #25 Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION for T.R.O. - filed by Jason Grimes. (eta) (Main Document 39 replaced on 4/29/2022 / Document reattached to separately attach the main document and exhibits ) (eta). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2022: #1 Missing Child Center - Hawaii poster, #2 Hawaii Police Department Police Reports (various), #3 Emergency Motion for Post Decree Relief, FCP 17-1-098K, #4 Ex Parte Motion to Advance/Expedite Hearing and Order, FCP 17-1-098K) (eta). Modified on 4/29/2022 (eta).
April 24, 2022 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by State of Hawaii. (Nugent, Mark)
April 22, 2022 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition to Separate Defendant State of Hawaii (Dkt. No #27 ) Motion to Dismiss; Brief; Memorandum in Support - filed by Tara Lasham. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jni) Modified on 4/25/2022 to add linkage to underlying motion (eta).
April 22, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim (Defendant Gerald W. Scatena's Motion For Dismissal Or, In The Alternative For Stay Of Proceedings0 Michael Oconnor appearing for Defendant Gerald W. Scatena (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration Gerald W. Scatena, #3 Main Document Notice Of Motion)(Oconnor, Michael) Modified on 4/25/2022 The motion is signed by Gerald W. Scatena, Esq. and reflects that he is proceeding pro se . The docket has been updated. The instant motion was e-filed by Michael O'Connor, Esq. (eta).
April 22, 2022 ADVISORY ENTRY-Incorrect Attorney Filer- Please be advised that Document #36 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim (Defendant Gerald W. Scatena's Motion For Dismissal Or, In The Alternative For Stay Of Proceedings was signed by someone other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. The filing party shall use its discretion should they feel the necessity to re-submit corrected filings. (jo)
April 20, 2022 Filing 35 EO: On April 19, 2022, Defendant Bruce Larson filed a motion to dismiss. Dkt. No. 33. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Larson's motion to dismiss: Plaintiff Tara Lasham's response shall be due on or before May 2, 2022; Larson's reply, if any, shall be due on or before May 9, 2022. Should a hearing be necessary after briefing on the motion to dismiss, the Court will enter an appropriate order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 20, 2022 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Order Entered on 4/14/2022; Proof of Mailing, re 31 - filed by Tara Lasham.(jni)
April 20, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Dkt. No. 35 has been served by First Class Mail to Tara Lasham and Jason Grimes at their addresses of record on April 20, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
April 19, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Compliant by Affidavit; Action for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief with Prejudice Robyn B. Chun appearing for Defendant Bruce Larson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Chun, Robyn)
April 18, 2022 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Order Entered on 4/12/2022; Proof of Mailing, re 24 - filed by Tara Lasham. (jni)
April 14, 2022 Filing 31 EO: On April 12, 2022, Plaintiff Tara Lasham filed an emergency motion for a temporary restraining order (Dkt. No. 25), her second motion for injunctive relief in this recently initiated case ("Second TRO motion"). On April 13, 2022, Defendant State of Hawaii filed a motion to dismiss ("motion to dismiss"). Dkt. No. 27. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for the above mentioned motions: responses to the Second TRO motion and motion to dismiss shall be due on or before April 25, 2022; replies in support of the TRO motion and the motion to dismiss, if any, shall be due on or before May 2, 2022. Should a hearing be necessary after briefing on the motions, the Court will enter an appropriate order. Plaintiff is instructed to serve a copy of this Order on each defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 14, 2022 Filing 30 Indemnity Bond filed by Tara Lasham. (apg)
April 14, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the Court's Order, Dkt. No. 31, has been served by First Class Mail to Tara Lasham and Jason Grimes at the addresses of record on April 14, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
April 13, 2022 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Response in Opposition to Separate Defendant Jason Grimes (Dkt. No. 23) Motion to Dismiss re: #28 - by Tara Lasham (jo)
April 13, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to Separate Defendant Jason Grimes (Dkt. No. #23 ) Motion to Dismiss - filed by Tara Lasham (jo)
April 13, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Mark T. Nugent appearing for Defendant State of Hawaii (Nugent, Mark)
April 12, 2022 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Ex Parte Emergency Motion For Rule 65(b) T.R.O. re: #25 - filed by Tara Lasham (jo)
April 12, 2022 Filing 25 Ex Parte Emergency MOTION for T.R.O. - by Plaintiff Tara Lasham (jo)
April 12, 2022 Filing 24 EO: On April 11, 2022, Plaintiff Tara Lasham filed a certificate of service in which she asserts that the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunctive relief ("TRO motion") has been served on all defendants. Dkt. No. 22. On the same day, Defendant Jason Grimes filed a pro se motion to dismiss this case ("motion to dismiss"). Dkt. No. 23. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on the above mentioned motions: responses to the TRO motion and motion to dismiss shall be due on or before April 25, 2022; replies in support of the TRO motion and the motion to dismiss, if any, shall be due on or before May 2, 2022. Should a hearing be necessary after briefing on the motions, the Court will enter an appropriate order. Plaintiff is instructed to serve a copy of this Order on each defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 12, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the Court's Order, Dkt. No. 24, has been served by First Class Mail to Tara Lasham and Jason Grimes at the addresses of record on April 12, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
April 11, 2022 Filing 23 Defendant Jason Grimes MOTION for Dismissal "With Prejudice" - by Defendant Jason Grimes (Attachments: #1 Missing Child Center-Hawaii poster, #2 Order in FC-P No. 17-1-098K (Family Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii))(eta)
April 11, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for TRO and Preliminary Injunctive Relief Against All Defendants re #6 - by Tara Lasham. (eta)
April 8, 2022 Filing 21 EO: On March 18, 2022, the Court instructed pro se plaintiff Tara Lasham that no further action would be taken on her motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunctive relief ("motion") until the motion, her complaint, and summons had been served on each defendant. Dkt. No. 16. Since that time, plaintiff has filed executed summonses, which purport to reflect that the complaint and summons were served on each defendant. See Dkt. Nos. 17-20. The executed summonses do not reflect, though, that the motion (Dkt. No. 6) was served on defendants. As a result, to be clear, before the Court will take any further action on plaintiff's motion, she must file proof of service of the motion on each defendant. Plaintiff shall have until April 18, 2022 to file proofs of service of the motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 8, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Dkt. No. 21 has been served by First Class Mail to Tara Lasham at the address of record on April 8, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Lasham. State of Hawaii served on 3/31/2022 through Holly Shikada c/o Department of the Attorney General. (eta)
April 4, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Lasham. Bruce Larson served on 4/3/2022. (eta)
March 24, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Lasham. Jason Grimes served on 3/21/2022. (eta)
March 24, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Lasham. Gerald W. Scatena served on 3/21/2022. (eta)
March 18, 2022 Filing 16 EO: On March 12, 2022, Plaintiff Tara Lasham filed her Complaint and a motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction in this case. Dkt. Nos. 1, 6. She also filed an application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs. Dkt. No. 3. On March 17, 2022, after an Order denying without prejudice her application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs, Dkt. No. 10, Lasham paid the filing fee for this case and summonses were subsequently issued, Dkts. Nos. 11-15. The Court will take no action on the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction until the motion, summons, and the Complaint have been served on each of the defendants. Lasham shall file proof of such service with the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
March 18, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to State of Hawaii (Holly Shikada, Attorney General, State of Hawaii). (eta)
March 18, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Gerald W. Scatena. (eta)
March 18, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bruce Larson. (eta)
March 18, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jason Grimes. (eta)
March 18, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #12 , #13 , #14 and #15 Summons Issued has been served by First Class Mail to Tara Lasham at the address of record on March 18, 2022. (eta)
March 18, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 16 Minute Order has been served by First Class Mail to Tara Lasham at the address of record on March 18, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 Filing fee: $ 402 [Pay.gov HID Online Payment Form], receipt number/Tracking ID: 26VC5GT6 re #1 Complaint by Tara Lasham. (eta)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS re #3 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/17/2022. Lasham may have until March 31, 2022 to file an application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs. The failure to timely file a complete application or pay the civil filing fee may result in the dismissal of this action without further consideration of the merits of the Complaint. Further, the Court will take no action on the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, Dkt. No. 6, until a complete application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs has been filed or the filing fee has been paid. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Lasham a blank Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 240). (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Tara Lasham has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on March 17, 2022. A blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (AO 24)) shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff.
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/9/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Tara Lasham has been served on March 14, 2022.
March 12, 2022 Filing 8 (Proposed) Summons as to Jason Grimes - by Tara Lasham. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Summons as to Bruce Larson, #2 (Proposed) Summons as to Gerald W. Scatena, #3 (Proposed) Summons as to Holly Shikada, Attorney General, State of Hawaii)(eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION for T.R.O. and Preliminary Injunctive Relief - filed by Tara Lasham. (eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for T.R.O. and Preliminary Injunctive Relief - by Plaintiff Tara Lasham (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of T.R.O. and Preliminary Injunctive Relief)(eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees - by Tara Lasham. (eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees - filed by Tara Lasham. (eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees - by Plaintiff Tara Lasham (eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Tara Lasham. (eta)
March 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Affidavit; Action for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; Jury Demand against All Defendants - filed by Tara Lasham, Co-Trustee, Kingdom of Heaven Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Holy Scriptures with private trust indenture therein per Public Law 97-280, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Bruce Larson, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Acts Done in Necessity, #4 Exhibit D - Evidence in Support of Notice of Acts Done in Necessity, #5 Exhibit E - Manatory Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit F - Hawaii State Plan, #7 Exhibit G - Application for CSEA Services, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Mistake and Rescission, #9 Exhibit I - Bonded Verified Claim Registered, #10 Exhibit J - Solvent Indemnity Bond, #11 Exhibit K - Declaration of Status, #12 Exhibit L - Judicial Notice of Private Trust Affidavit, #13 Exhibit M - Judicial Notice of Subject Matter Jurisdictional Inquiry, #14 Exhibit N - Memorandum of Law (Jeff Sessions), #15 Exhibit O - Estoppel, #16 Exhibit P - Notice to Cease and Desist, #17 Exhibit Q - Email and Text Communications of Jason Grimes, #18 Exhibit R - Religious Exemption COVID, #19 Exhibit S - 1st Response to Motion by Civil Rule 9 Affidavit of Negative Averment, #20 Exhibit T - 2nd Response to Emergency Motion by Rule 9 Affidavit of Negative Averment, #21 Exhibit U - Affidavit in Support of TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Brief, #22 Exhibit V - Emergency Motion for Post Decree Reliefm Memorandum, Declaration of Jason Grimes, Exhibits A-E, Notice of Hearing, COS)(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasham v. Grimes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Lasham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald W. Scatena
Represented By: Gerald Wayne Scatena
Represented By: Michael Oconnor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Larson
Represented By: Robyn B. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Mark T. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?