Brenha v. Derr
Petitioner: Jack Brenha
Respondent: Estela Derr
Case Number: 1:2022cv00126
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 Petitioner's RESPONSE to #7 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241; (Certificate of Service) - filed by Jack Brenha. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; COS filed by Estela Derr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry Yee, #2 Declaration of Kris Robl, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Exhibit "B", #5 Exhibit "C", #6 Exhibit "D", #7 Exhibit "E", #8 Exhibit "F", #9 Exhibit "G")(Yee, Harry)
April 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Yee on behalf of Estela Derr on behalf of Estela Derr. (Yee, Harry)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 Motion in Support of #1 Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Jack Brenha. The case number should reflect CV 22-00126 LEK-KJM. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PETITIONER, JACK BRENHA'S PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241. On March 28, 2022, the Court received Petitioner Jack Brenha's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 [ECF No. #1 ]. The Court received Petitioner's filing fee for this action on April 7, 2022 [ECF No. #3 ]. The government is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Petition on or before May 11, 2022, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file an optional Reply on or before June 10, 2022. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Entering Order and the Petition on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 11, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PETITIONER, JACK BRENHA'S PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus has been served through interoffice delivery to the U.S. Attorney's Office on April 11, 2022. A copy of the #4 Entering Order shall be served by First Class Mail to Jack Brenha at the address of record on April 12, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eta)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI032479 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (eta)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER re #1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/28/2022. (eta)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 - filed by Jack Brenha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
March 28, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER shall be served by First Class Mail to Jack Brenha at the address of record on March 29, 2022. An Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, its instructions and a file-stamped copy of the habeas petition shall be included in the mailing to Petitioner. (eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenha v. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jack Brenha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Estela Derr
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?