Yanagihara v. Derr
Petitioner: Chaes Yanagihara
Respondent: Estella Derr
Case Number: 1:2022cv00145
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; COS filed by Estella Derr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Natalie Moreland Villalon, #2 Declaration of Kris Robl, #3 Declaration of Susan Giddings, #4 Exhibit "A", #5 Exhibit "B", #6 Exhibit "C", #7 Exhibit "D", #8 Exhibit "E", #9 Exhibit "F")(Moreland, Natalie)
April 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie E. Moreland on behalf of Estella Derr on behalf of Estella Derr. (Moreland, Natalie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 EO: On April 4, 2022, the Court received Petitioner Chaes Yanagihara's [ECF No. 1] Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 [ECF No. 1]. The Court received Petitioner's [ECF No. 5] filing fee for this action on April 11, 2022. The government is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Petition on or before May 10, 2022, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file an optional Reply on or before May 31, 2022. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Entering Order and the Petition on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii. IT IS SO ORDERED (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).
April 12, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 6 Entering Order has been served by email to AUSA Michael Albanese (michael.albanese@usdoj.gov), AUSA Mark Inciong (mark.inciong@usdoj.gov), and AUSA Rachel Moriyama (rachel.moriyama@usdoj.gov) on April 12, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (shm)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI032497 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (eta)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of Petitioner Chaes Yanagihara submitted for re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(tl)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/5/2022. (eta)
April 5, 2022 ADVISORY ENTRY. No Signature-Please be advised that Document #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Chaes Yanagihara is not signed. The petitioner is instructed to sign the enclosed copy of the habeas petition and return it to the Clerk's Office in the enclosed "business reply" envelope. (eta)
April 5, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to Chaes Yanagihara at the address of record on April 5, 2022. The following documents were also included in the mailing to Petitioner: 1) Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions; 2) a file-stamped copy of the unsigned habeas petition; 3) Advisory Entry Re: No Signature and 4) a "business reply" envelope. (eta)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 (unsigned) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 - filed by Chaes Yanagihara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Documentation)(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanagihara v. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chaes Yanagihara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Estella Derr
Represented By: Natalie E. Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?