Marler v. Derr
Petitioner: Thomas E. Marler
Respondent: Estela Derr
Case Number: 1:2022cv00240
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 EO: On June 2, 2022, the Court received Petitioner Thomas E. Marler's [ECF No. 1] Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. The Court received Petitioner's [ECF No. 6] filing fee associated with this action on June 22, 2022. The government is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Petition on or before August 4, 2022, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file an optional Reply on or before September 1, 2022. In their respective filings, the government and Petitioner should include a discussion of whether the Petition is moot given that Petitioner is no longer incarcerated at the Federal Detention Center in Honolulu, Hawaii. See Bureau of Prisons, https://www.bop.gov/inmateloc/ (select "Find By Number"; enter "05720-093" in "Number" field; and select "Search") (last visited June 23, 2022); see also Gonzalez v. Grondolsky, 152 F. Supp. 3d 39, 4347 (D. Mass. 2016) (dismissing without prejudice petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 because petitioner was transferred to a correctional facility outside the district). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Entering Order and the Petition on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(tl)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address - by Thomas E. Marler (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5, Receipt Number HI032879 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jni)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 Prisoner Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. 4 Entry Order filed on 6/7/2022). Mail sent to Thomas E. Marler at Federal Detention Center Honolulu, P.O. Box 30080, Honolulu, HI 96820, returned to sender, unable to forward, not at this address. (jni)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/2/2022. (jni)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST for Withdrawal of Inmate's Personal Funds submitted by Petitioner Thomas E. Marler to the Federal Bureau of Prisons, dated May 29, 2022. (jni)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 - filed by Thomas E. Marler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
June 2, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a file-stamped copy of #1 Petition, #2 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Personal Funds, and #3 Deficiency Order shall be served by First Class Mail to Thomas E. Marler at the address of record on 6/3/2022. Additionally, an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, and its instructions, shall be included in the mailing to Petitioner. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marler v. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas E. Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Estela Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?