Waiea Management Development Company, LLC v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Waiea Management Development Company, LLC
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00271
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR STAY AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/5/2022. The Court STAYS this action. See Clinton v. Jones, 520 U.S. 681, 706-07 (1997); Leyva v. Certified Grocers of Cal., Ltd., 593 F.2d 857, 863-64 (9th Cir. 1979). The Court therefore VACATES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for August 16, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter.In addition to the requirements the parties have stipulated to above, the parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report regarding the status of the State Court Action by no later than February 6, 2023 if the stay has not been lifted by that date.Finally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close this case while it is stayed.(jni)
July 22, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waiea Management Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David)
July 11, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schulmeister, David)
June 23, 2022 Filing 19 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 6/22/2022. SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE for all further proceedings. Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00271 JAO-WRP on all further filings. (jni)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JEFFREY L. WILLIAN re #13 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/22/2022. (eta)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO AUSTIN C. NORRIS re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/22/2022. (eta)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 EO: At Defendants' request, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 7/18/2022 to 8/16/2022 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey L. Willian) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2696414.David J. Minkin appearing for Plaintiff Waiea Management Development Company, LLC (Minkin, David)
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Austin C. Norris) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2696386.David J. Minkin appearing for Plaintiff Waiea Management Development Company, LLC (Minkin, David)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DAVID C. VEIS re: #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/14/2022. DAVID C. VEIS, ESQ. (Firm: Clyde & Co US LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Defendants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, and Federal Insurance Company (jo)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc. (The) for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Federal Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent ZURICH INSURANCE GROUP LTD for Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Re: David C. Veis] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2693819.Lisa Katherine Swartzfager appearing for Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company (Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Federal Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Swartzfager, Lisa)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/18/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00271 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Federal Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-22-0000435. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2693703), filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Zurich American Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LISA K. SWARTZFAGER, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waiea Management Development Company, LLC v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waiea Management Development Company, LLC
Represented By: David J. Minkin
Represented By: Jordan K. Inafuku
Represented By: Megan Ashley Coburn
Represented By: Michael H. Tsuchida
Represented By: Randall K. Schmitt
Represented By: Austin C. Norris
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Willian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: David Schulmeister
Represented By: Bryce Matthew Nakamura
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Osterkamp
Represented By: Kirk M. Neste
Represented By: Lisa Katherine Swartzfager
Represented By: Michael L. Hoke
Represented By: David C. Veis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: David Schulmeister
Represented By: Bryce Matthew Nakamura
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Osterkamp
Represented By: Kirk M. Neste
Represented By: Lisa Katherine Swartzfager
Represented By: Michael L. Hoke
Represented By: David C. Veis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: David Schulmeister
Represented By: Bryce Matthew Nakamura
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Osterkamp
Represented By: Kirk M. Neste
Represented By: Lisa Katherine Swartzfager
Represented By: Michael L. Hoke
Represented By: David C. Veis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: David Schulmeister
Represented By: Bryce Matthew Nakamura
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Osterkamp
Represented By: Kirk M. Neste
Represented By: Lisa Katherine Swartzfager
Represented By: Michael L. Hoke
Represented By: David C. Veis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?