Greer v. State of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: Donald S. Greer
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, Catherine P. Awakuni Colon, Regulated Industries Complaints Office, Esther Brown, Department of Human Services, Department of Labour and Industrial Relations, Hawaii Civil Rights Commission, County of Kauai, Kauai Police Department, Todd G. Raybuck, Christopher Calio, Kauai Police Commission and Doe Defendants 1-100
Case Number: 1:2022cv00286
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald S. Greer. Todd G. Raybuck served on 8/15/2022. (eta)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald S. Greer. Kauai Police Department served on 8/15/2022. (eta)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald S. Greer. Kauai Police Commission served on 8/15/2022. (eta)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald S. Greer. Christopher Calio served on 8/15/2022. (eta)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 8/23/2022 to 10/17/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. Plaintiff shall inform Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at, Don1retired@gmail.com, the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Hawaii. State of Hawaii waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Regulated Industries Complaints Office. Regulated Industries Complaints Office waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hawaii Civil Rights Commission. Hawaii Civil Rights Commission waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Department of Labour and Industrial Relations. Department of Labour and Industrial Relations waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Department of Human Services. Department of Human Services waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Catherine P. Awakuni Colon. Catherine P. Awakuni Colon waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Esther Brown. Esther Brown waiver sent on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (eta)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #9 Scheduling Conference Statement - by Donald S. Greer (eta)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement - by Donald S. Greer. (eta)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by County of Kauai. County of Kauai waiver sent on 7/5/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (eta)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 402, Pay.gov Tracking ID: 270LN2ND re #1 Complaint (eta)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/23/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Donald S. Greer has been served by email on June 29, 2022.
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT of Facts - filed by Donald S. Greer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Attachment 11, #12 Attachment 12, #13 Attachment 13, #14 Attachment 14, #15 Attachment 15, #16 Attachment 16 (Part 1 of 5), #17 Attachment 16 (Part 2 of 5), #18 Attachment 16 (Part 3 of 5), #19 Attachment 16 (Part 4 of 5), #20 Attachment 16 (Part 5 of 5), #21 Attachment 17, #22 Attachment 18, #23 Attachment 19, #24 Attachment 20, #25 Attachment 21, #26 Attachment 22, #27 Attachment 23, #28 Attachment 24, #29 Attachment 25 (Omitted), #30 Attachment 26, #31 Attachment 27, #32 Attachment 28, #33 Attachment 29, #34 Attachment 30, #35 Attachment 31, #36 Attachment 32, #37 Attachment 33, #38 Attachment 34, #39 Attachment 35, #40 Attachment 36, #41 Attachment 37, #42 Attachment 38, #43 Attachment 39, #44 Attachment 40, #45 Attachment 41, #46 Attachment 42, #47 Attachment 43, #48 Attachment 44, #49 Attachment 45, #50 Certificate)(eta)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiffs' MEMORANDUM Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment re #1 - filed by Donald S. Greer. (eta)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Donald S. Greer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(eta)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial; Motion for Summary Judgment against All Defendants - filed by Donald S. Greer.(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald S. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine P. Awakuni Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regulated Industries Complaints Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labour and Industrial Relations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Civil Rights Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kauai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kauai Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd G. Raybuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Calio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kauai Police Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?