London v. Heh et al
Plaintiff: Ali London
Defendant: Michael Heh, Maria Heh, Wendy Stafford, Nicole Linke, Turtle Bay Condos LLC, Honolulu Police Department, City and County of Honolulu, Andrew Tyau-Beam, Byron L. Beatty and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 1:2022cv00491
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 31 EO: To allow counsel sufficient time to serve the parties and to allow sufficient time for parties to answer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 01/23/2023 IS CONTINUED TO 03/06/2023 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 02/27/2023.Parties are to participate via telephone through our NEW ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 OBSERVERS: Call-in:1-650-479-3207, Code: 160 930 3683 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 17, 2023 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali London. Maria Heh served on 1/9/2023. (Stewart, Andrew)
January 17, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali London. Michael Heh served on 1/9/2023. (Stewart, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Filing 28 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plainitff. (Stewart, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Filing 27 Defendant City and County of Honolulu's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Campbell, Sarah) Modified on 1/17/2023 (eta).
January 9, 2023 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Byron L. Beatty. (eta)
January 9, 2023 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Andrew Tyau-Beam. (eta)
January 6, 2023 Filing 24 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
January 6, 2023 Filing 23 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
December 14, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali London. Honolulu Police Department served on 12/13/2022. (Stewart, Andrew)
December 14, 2022 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ali London. City and County of Honolulu served on 12/13/2022. (Stewart, Andrew)
December 12, 2022 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Honolulu Police Department. (eta)
December 12, 2022 Filing 19 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
December 9, 2022 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Wendy Stafford. (eta)
December 8, 2022 Filing 17 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 25, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Turtle Bay Condos LLC. (eta)
November 25, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Michael Heh. (eta)
November 25, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Maria Heh. (eta)
November 25, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Nicole Linke. (eta)
November 25, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu (c/o Office of the Corporation Counsel, 530 South King Street, Room 110, Honolulu, Hawaii 96813). (eta)
November 25, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu (c/o Office of Corporation Counsel, 530 South King Street, Suite 318, Honolulu, Hawaii 96813). (eta)
November 23, 2022 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 23, 2022 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Stewart, Andrew)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/23/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00491 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ali London. (AHIDC-2767099$ 402.00) (Stewart, Andrew) Modified on 11/21/2022 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: London v. Heh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali London
Represented By: Andrew D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Heh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Heh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Linke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Bay Condos LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Sarah K.Z. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Tyau-Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron L. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?