Foster v. Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Caroline T. Foster
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. and Lois Osorno
Case Number: 1:2022cv00519
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno re #21 Scheduling Conference Statement (Iriye, Judy)
February 3, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno re #20 Initial Disclosure (Iriye, Judy)
February 3, 2023 Filing 22 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno re #15 Scheduling Conference Statement (Rule 16 Report of the Conference of Parties) (Iriye, Judy) Modified on 2/6/2023 (eta).
February 2, 2023 Filing 21 Defendants Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. and Lois Osorno's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Iriye, Judy) Modified on 2/3/2023 (eta).
February 2, 2023 Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno. (Iriye, Judy)
January 31, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Plaintiff Caroline T. Foster's Initial Disclosures, served on Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.) - by Caroline T. Foster. (jni)
January 31, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Plaintiff Caroline T. Foster's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement, served on Lois Osorno) - by Caroline T. Foster. (jni)
January 31, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Plaintiff Caroline T. Foster's Initial Disclosures, served on Lois Osorno) - by Caroline T. Foster. (jni) Modified on 2/1/2023 (jni)
January 31, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Plaintiff Caroline T. Foster's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement, served on Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.) - by Caroline T. Foster. (jni) Modified on 2/1/2023 (jni)
January 31, 2023 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement (Rule 16 Report of the Conference of Parties). (Iriye, Judy)
January 27, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Iriye, Judy)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 1/26/2023.SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. Please reflect new Civil case number CV 22-00519 DKW-RT on all further filings.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 1/27/2023. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 Rule 16 Report of the Conference of Parties - filed by Caroline T. Foster. (jni)
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco LP, Other Affiliate Energy Transfer LP for Aloha Petroleum, Ltd... (Iriye, Judy)
January 6, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Certificate of Service by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Lois Osorno.(Iriye, Judy)
December 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroline T. Foster. Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. served on 12/16/2022. (apg)
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroline T. Foster. Lois Osorno served on 12/16/2022. (apg)
December 15, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Lois Osorno. (jni)
December 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. (jni)
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/13/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/15/2022. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served in person at the Clerk's Office service counter. (jni)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Caroline T. Foster. (jni)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402, Receipt number HI033901 re #1 Complaint. (jni)
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT; EXHIBITS A-K against All Defendants - filed by Caroline T. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I Restricted, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (jni)Modified on 12/15/2022 to provisionally restrict Exhibit I as it contains personal identifiers. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline T. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Osorno
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?