Bigelow v. Great American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ian Bigelow
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company, Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc., John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10 and Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00545
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 EP: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2023. TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is set for May 3, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.Parties are to participate via telephone through our ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 Observers may call in on a separate line at 1-650-479-3207, Code: 160 930 3683.If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio by email at bbb@hid.uscourts.gov at anytime.(ZOOM Tele-Conference 9:35 - 9:39) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany A. Chiu on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Chiu, Tiffany)
January 27, 2023 Filing 15 EO: In light of the pending #7 Motion to Dismiss and contemplated additional early dispositive motions the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is converted into a Telephonic Status Conference is set for the same date and time of 01/30/2023 at 9:30 a.m. Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Parties are to participate via telephone through our ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 Observers may call in on a separate line at 1-650-479-3207, Code: 160 930 3683. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lewis Salenger on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Salenger, Andrew)
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 EO: Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed on October 18, 2022 (Dkt. No. 7), filed on January 23, 2023, is set for hearing on March 31, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kupono before CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Briefing on the motion shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. (CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
January 24, 2023 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT re #6 Report of Planning Meeting by Great American Insurance Company . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Max J. Kimura, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kimura, Max)
January 24, 2023 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement for Defendant Great American Insurance Company. (Eyerly, Tred)
January 23, 2023 Filing 10 Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Kawana, Sabrina) Modified on 1/24/2023 (eta).
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hiscox, Ltd. for Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc... (Kawana, Sabrina)
January 23, 2023 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Bonner, Addison) Modified on 1/24/2023 (eta).
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed on October 18, 2022; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Sabrina M. Kawana; Exhibits H1-H3; Certificate of Service Sabrina M. Kawana appearing for Defendant Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Sabrina M. Kawana, #3 Exhibit H1, #4 Exhibit H2, #5 Exhibit H3, #6 Certificate of Service)(Kawana, Sabrina)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint Rule 26(F) Report of Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan) ; Certificate of Service. (Bonner, Addison) Modified on 1/18/2023 (eta).
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 Defendant Great American Insurance Companys ANSWER to Complaint filed on October 18, 2022 by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kimura, Max)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for Great American Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/30/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 12/29/2022. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00545 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Exhibits "A"-"D"; Certificate of Service by Great American Insurance Company from First Circuit Court of the State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-22-0001286. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2779613), filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Eyerly, Tred) Modified on 12/29/2022 (jni)
December 29, 2022 NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) or 12.4(a) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigelow v. Great American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Bigelow
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Max J Kimura
Represented By: Tred R. Eyerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lewis Salenger
Represented By: Tiffany A. Chiu
Represented By: Sabrina M. Kawana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?