Haughton v. Colbran et al
Plaintiff: Peter Scott Haughton
Defendant: Registrar Nicola Colbran, Retired Justice Richard White and John Shanahan
Case Number: 1:2023cv00045
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 21 Mail Returned by USPS, re: 20 Entering Order. Mail re-sent to Peter Scott Haughton at 624 Brodie Road, Huntfield Heights, South Australia 5163. (jni) Modified on 3/22/2023 (jni)
March 20, 2023 Filing 20 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2023 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is CONTINUED to 6/21/2023 at 08:45AM. Scheduling conference statements must be filed by 6/14/2023.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free).Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
March 16, 2023 Filing 19 EO: #18 Corrected REQUEST for Default Judgment, #17 REQUEST for Default Judgment - Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 5/4/2023 at 11:00 AM (HST) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free).Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
March 16, 2023 Filing 18 Corrected REQUEST for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55b(1) Federal Rule of Civil Procedure - by Plaintiff Peter Scott Haughton (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter Scott Haughton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(eta)
March 14, 2023 Filing 17 REQUEST for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55b of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure - by Plaintiff Peter Scott Haughton (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter Scott Haughton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(eta)
March 3, 2023 Filing 16 (Text Entry Only/No pdf attached) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John Shanahan re #15 - by /s/ Pam Hartman Beyer, Clerk by /s/EA, Deputy Clerk on 3/3/2023. (eta)
March 3, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 16 Clerk's Entry of Default has been served by email to Peter Haugton at trophytruck100@gmail.com on March 3, 2023. (eta)
March 2, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Clerk's Certificate of Entry of Default - by Peter Scott Haughton. (Attachments: #1 Annexure A, #2 Annexure B)(eta)
March 1, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Scott Haughton. Nicola Colbran served on 2/28/2023 2/7/2023. (eta) Modified on 3/3/2023 (eta).
March 1, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Scott Haughton. Richard White served on 2/28/2023 2/22/2023. (eta) Modified on 3/3/2023 (eta).
March 1, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Scott Haughton. John Shanahan served on 2/28/2023 2/7/2023 . (eta) Modified on 3/3/2023 (eta).
February 3, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against All Defendants - filed by Peter Scott Haughton.(eta)
January 31, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Shanahan. (eta)
January 31, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Richard White. (eta)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nicola Colbran. (eta)
January 30, 2023 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 402 (receipt reflects payment of $405), Pay.gov Tracking ID: 273KTO9N re #1 Complaint. (eta)
January 27, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Peter Scott Haughton. (eta)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. FILING INSTRUCTIONS ARE ATTACHED. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (Attachments: #1 Election Form ) (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Haughton was served by email to trophytruck100@gmail.com on January 26, 2023.
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/3/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/26/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Haughton was served by email to trophytruck100@gmail.com on January 26, 2023. A file-stamped copy of the Complaint was included in the email transmission to Plaintiff.
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/26/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Haughton was served by email to trophytruck100@gmail.com on January 26, 2023. An Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs was included in the email transmission to Plaintiff.
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 (Proposed) Summons to Nicola Colbran re #1 Complaint - filed by Peter Scott Haughton. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Summons to Richard White, #2 (Proposed) Summons to John Shanahan)(eta)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against All Defendants - filed by Peter Scott Haughton.(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haughton v. Colbran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Scott Haughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar Nicola Colbran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retired Justice Richard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?