Markwell v. Cheeseman et al
Plaintiff: Donna L. Markwell
Defendant: Hon Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman, Registrar Geoff Segal and Adam Griffin
Case Number: 1:2023cv00080
Filed: February 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/16/2023 pursuant to ECF #20 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #11 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/16/2023. For the foregoing reasons, and because Plaintiff had previously been given an opportunity to correct jurisdictional deficiencies, the First Amended Complaint, ECF No. 11, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Adam Griffin. (jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Geoff Segal. (jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman. (jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 16 Proposed Summons (Adam Griffin) - by Donna L. Markwell.(jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed Summons (Geoff Segal) - by Donna L. Markwell.(jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Summons (Hon. Justice Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman) - by Donna L. Markwell.(jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 13 Filing fee received: $ 402, Receipt number Tracking ID: 274CNVLT. (jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 12 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Donna L. Markwell. (jni)
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman, Geoff Segal, Adam Griffin - filed by Donna L. Markwell.(jni)
March 3, 2023 Filing 10 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by Email - by Plaintiff Donna Markwell. (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide for Using Notices of Electronic Filing) (jni)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT re #3 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/17/2023. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaint, ECF No. 1, with leave to amend, and (2) DENIES the IFP Application, ECF No. 3, as moot. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, she must comply with the following requirements:(1) the deadline to file an amended complaint is March 20, 2023;(2) the amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint"; and(3) Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above.Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to timely file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order and concurrently file a new IFP Application or submit the filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 2/17/2023. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
February 14, 2023 Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
February 12, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons (Adam Griffin) - by Donna L. Markwell.
February 12, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons (Geoff Segal) - by Donna L. Markwell.
February 12, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons (Hon. Justice Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman) - by Donna L. Markwell. (jni)
February 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/10/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/12/2023. (jni)
February 12, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Donna L. Markwell. (jni)
February 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Donna L. Markwell. (jni)
February 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman, Geoff Segal, Adam Griffin - filed by Donna L. Markwell.(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markwell v. Cheeseman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Markwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Elizabeth Ann Cheeseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar Geoff Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?