Cooper v. Courtney et al
Plaintiff: Richard John Cooper
Defendant: Justin David Courtney, Magistrate Kate White and Christopher Mark Chapman
Case Number: 1:2023cv00106
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Filing 21 REQUEST for Clerk's Certificate of Entry of Default (Defendant Justin David Courtney) - by Richard John Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Annexures, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Annexures)(jni)
April 21, 2023 Filing 20 REQUEST for Clerk's Certificate of Entry of Default (Defendant Christopher Mark Chapman) - by Richard John Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Annexures, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Annexures)(jni)
April 14, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard John Cooper. Christopher Mark Chapman served on 3/8/2023. (jni)
April 13, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard John Cooper. Christopher Mark Chapman served on 3/8/2023. (eta)
April 13, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 4/13/2023 pursuant to ECF #16 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Richard John Cooper shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 4/13/2023. A courtesy copy of the foregoing shall also be mailed to the Crown Solicitor's Office, Consumer and Business Services, Attn: Emma De Favari, GPO Box 1719, Adelaide SA 5001, DX 225. (jni)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 4/13/2023. For the foregoing reasons, the Complaint, ECF No. 1, is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Richard John Cooper shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 4/13/2023. A courtesy copy of the foregoing shall also be mailed to the Crown Solicitor's Office, Consumer and Business Services, Attn: Emma De Favari, GPO Box 1719, Adelaide SA 5001, DX 225. (jni)
March 28, 2023 Filing 15 SHOW CAUSE re #10 - filed by Richard John Cooper. (jni)
March 24, 2023 Filing 14 Letter addressed to Judge Otake from Emma De Favari, Crown Solicitor's Office, dated March 24, 2023, re: order to show cause. (jni)
March 24, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #14 Letter shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 3/28/2023. (jni)
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Christopher Mark Chapman. (jni)
March 2, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Justin David Courtney. (jni)
March 2, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Kate White. (jni)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/28/2023. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff must file a response to this Order to Show Cause by March 29, 2023, by either explaining why dismissal is not warranted or filing an amended complaint that cures the foregoing deficiencies. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause will result in a finding that Plaintiff has failed to carry his burden of establishing subject matter jurisdiction and the Court will dismiss the action without prejudice.Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2023.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 3/1/2023. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) (jni)
February 27, 2023 Filing 9 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
February 24, 2023 Filing 8 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, Receipt number Pay.gov Tracking ID: 27443E51 re #1 Complaint. (jni)
February 24, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons (Kate White) - by Richard John Cooper. (jni)
February 24, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons (Justin David Courtney) - by Richard John Cooper. (jni)
February 24, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons (Christopher Mark Chapman) - by Richard John Cooper.
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/24/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/24/2023. (jni)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER re #1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/24/2023. (jni)
February 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Richard John Cooper. (jni)
February 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against Justin David Courtney, Kate White - filed by Richard John Cooper.(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Courtney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard John Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin David Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Kate White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Mark Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?