Turner v. Trad et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Ann Turner
Defendant: J M Trad, Buddy Arron Stuart, Thomas Fajks, Kylie Maree Horner, Simon Salim Haddad, Ryan Martin, James Wilson, Enoch Bailey and Chad Chamberlain
Case Number: 1:2023cv00113
Filed: March 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Filing 16 EO: On 3/24/23, the Court issued #12 Order Dismissing First Amended Complaint without Prejudice ("Order"), that dismissed this case for lack of jurisdiction. At the time it issued the Order, the Court had not reviewed #14 Civil Cover Sheet Showing Cause ("Civil Cover Sheet") and #15 Errata re #10 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs ("Errata"). The Civil Cover Sheet does not change the outcome of the Order because it does not remedy the underlying jurisdictional problems with the First Amended Complaint. The Errata does not correct anything substantive in #10 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs and so is irrelevant to the resolution of this matter. The Order stands as the final decision on the First Amended Complaint. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
March 24, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 3/24/2023 pursuant to ECF #12 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). (jni)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/24/2023. For the foregoing reasons, and because Plaintiff had previously been given an opportunity to correct jurisdictional deficiencies, the First Amended Complaint, ECF No. 8, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The IFP Application, ECF No. 10, is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).(jni)
March 23, 2023 Filing 15 Errata re #10 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - filed by Nicole Ann Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(jni)
March 23, 2023 Filing 14 Civil Cover Sheet Showing Cause - by Nicole Ann Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jni)
March 23, 2023 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) by Nicole Ann Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jni)
March 22, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Nicole Ann Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(jni)
March 22, 2023 Filing 9 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Nicole Ann Turner. (jni)
March 22, 2023 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against Enoch Bailey, Chad Chamberlain, Thomas Fajks, Simon Salim Haddad, Kylie Maree Horner, Ryan Martin, Buddy Arron Stuart, J M Trad, James Wilson - filed by Nicole Ann Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(jni)
March 17, 2023 Filing 7 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by Email - by Plaintiff Nicole Turner. (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide for Using Notices of Electronic Filing) (jni)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AS MOOT re #5 , #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 3/7/2023. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaint, ECF No. 1, with leave to amend, and (2) DENIES the IFP Application, ECF No. 5, as moot. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, she must comply with the following requirements:(1) the deadline to file an amended complaint is April 7, 2023;(2) the amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint"; and(3) Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above.Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to timely file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order and concurrently file a new IFP Application or submit the filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants shall be served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF) on 3/8/2023. (jni)
March 4, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Nicole Ann Turner. (jni)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/1/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/1/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by email to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). (jni)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER re #1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/1/2023. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by email to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Additionally, an Application to Proceed in Forma Paupers, and its instructions, were included in the email to Plaintiff. (jni)
March 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against Enoch Bailey, Chad Chamberlain, Thomas Fajks, Simon Salim Haddad, Kylie Maree Horner, Ryan Martin, Buddy Arron Stuart, J M Trad, James Wilson - filed by Nicole Ann Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Trad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ann Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Trad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Arron Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Fajks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kylie Maree Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Salim Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enoch Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?