Al-Lami v. Al-Kaissy
Plaintiff: Entesar Al-Lami
Defendant: Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy, Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv00169
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2023 Filing 33 Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 625 re #32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [as to J. Noble Simpson, Esq.] (eta)
June 8, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [as to J. Noble Simpson, Esq.] ; Declaration of Counsel Filing fee $ 300.Adrian L. Lavarias appearing for Defendants Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy, Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy (Lavarias, Adrian) Modified on 6/8/2023 (eta).
June 5, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dickinson Ferry, III on behalf of Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy, Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy on behalf of Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy, Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ferry, John)
June 5, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrian L. Lavarias on behalf of Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy, Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy on behalf of Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy, Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lavarias, Adrian)
June 2, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Entesar Al-Lami re #24 Notice (Other) (Amended Certificate of Service) (Osaki, Carl)
June 1, 2023 Filing 28 Return of Service on Subpoena Straub Medical Center was served on 5/25/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
June 1, 2023 Filing 27 Return of Service on Subpoena First Hawaiian Bank was served on 5/25/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
June 1, 2023 Filing 26 Return of Service on Subpoena Honolulu Police Department was served on 5/30/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
May 30, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Entesar Al-Lami re #24 Notice (Other) (Osaki, Carl)
May 30, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE by Entesar Al-Lami re #21 Order on Motion for Discovery, Notice of Deposition on Written Questions to Honolulu Police Department, First Hawaiian Bank, and Straub Medical Center Entesar Al-Lami. (Osaki, Carl)
May 29, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Entesar Al-Lami re #22 Notice (Other) (Osaki, Carl)
May 29, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE by Entesar Al-Lami re #21 Order on Motion for Discovery, Notice of Deposition on Written Questions to United Parcel Service Entesar Al-Lami. (Osaki, Carl)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ENTESAR AL-LAMI'S FURTHER REQUEST TO CONDUCT DOCUMENT DISCOVERY IN LIGHT OF DISCLOSURES MADE TO DATE PURSUANT TO THE "ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ENTESAR AL-LAMI'S SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE,", FILED APRIL 21, 2023 (DOCUMENT 10) re #20 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/24/2023. (eta)
May 21, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM (Update) re #10 Order Granting Plaintiff Entesar Al-Lami's Second Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Conduct Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Request to Conduct Further Document Discovery in Light of Disclosures Made to Date filed by Entesar Al-Lami. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H)(Osaki, Carl) Modified on 5/22/2023 (eta). Modified on 5/23/2023 (jo)
May 20, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Entesar Al-Lami. Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy waiver sent on 4/19/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Osaki, Carl)
May 20, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Entesar Al-Lami. Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy waiver sent on 4/19/2023, answer due 6/20/2023. (Osaki, Carl)
May 19, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Entesar Al-Lami re 16 Set Hearings,, Terminate Hearings, Re: Electronic Order, filed May 16, 2023 (Osaki, Carl)
May 16, 2023 Filing 16 EO: In order to allow time for service, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 6/6/2023 to 8/28/2023 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. The public may listen to the proceedings by dialing the Public Dial-in number at 1-650-479-3207 and entering Access code: 1601263445. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
May 2, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Entesar Al-Lami (Ex Parte Motion to Take Limited Discovery, Order, SDT on HPD, and SDT of FHB (Osaki, Carl)
May 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Taking Deposition Upon Written Questions; Questions by Entesar Al-Lami re #12 Return of Service on Subpoena Re: Honolulu Police Department Entesar Al-Lami. (Osaki, Carl) Modified on 5/2/2023 (eta).
May 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Taking Deposition Upon Questions; Questions by Entesar Al-Lami re #11 Return of Service on Subpoena Re: First Hawaiian Bank Entesar Al-Lami. (Osaki, Carl) Modified on 5/2/2023 (eta).
April 28, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service on Subpoena Custodian of Records, Honolulu Police Department was served on 4/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Proof of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
April 28, 2023 Filing 11 Return of Service on Subpoena Custodian of Records, First Hawaiian Bank was served on 4/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - redacted, #2 Supplement Proof of Service)(Osaki, Carl)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ENTESAR AL-LAMI'S SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY PRIOR TO THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/21/2023. (eta)
April 20, 2023 ADVISORY ENTRY. Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDFS - Please be advised that the exhibits included in Document #9 Second EX PARTE Motion for Permission to Conduct Discovery Prior to Rule 16 Scheduling Conference filed Entesar Al-Lami, are comprised of several exhibits and not submitted as separate pdf attachments. The filing party may refer to Section 5.0 (Exhibits) of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document. No further action is necessary. (eta)
April 19, 2023 Filing 9 Second EX PARTE Motion for Permission to Conduct Discovery Prior to Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; Declaration of Carl H. Osaki; Declaration of Michael Zawawi; Declaration of Entesar Al-Lami; Exhibits "A" Through "E" Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Entesar Al-Lami (Osaki, Carl) Modified on 4/20/2023 (eta).
April 18, 2023 Filing 8 EO: The Court DENIES #7 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Conduct Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference because Plaintiff fails to establish good cause for pursuing early discovery. See Jiang v. Fang, No. CV 20-00100 KJM, 2020 WL 13252321, at *1 (D. Haw. July 22, 2020) ("Good cause may be found where the need for expedited discovery, in consideration of the administration of justice, outweighs the prejudice to the responding party."). Plaintiff does not address the good cause standard and argues only that early discovery "would facilitate an understanding of the facts of this action." (ECF No. #7 , Carl Osaki Declaration 7). Absent a showing of good cause, the Court declines to authorize Plaintiff's request for limited early discovery under Federal Rules of Civil procedure Rule 26(d)(1). (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
April 16, 2023 Filing 7 EX PARTE Motion For Permission To Conduct Limited Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; Declaration of Carl H. Osaki; Declaration of Michael Zawawi; Declaration of Entesar Al-Lami; Exhibits "A" Through "C" Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Entesar Al-Lami (Osaki, Carl) Modified on 4/17/2023 (eta).
April 11, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/6/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/11/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
April 11, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
April 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00169 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
April 11, 2023 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Osaki, Carl)
April 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2824884.), filed by Entesar Al-Lami.(Osaki, Carl) Modified on 4/11/2023 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Lami v. Al-Kaissy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entesar Al-Lami
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassidy Mary Frances Al-Kaissy
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Represented By: John Dickinson Ferry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophie Kathleen Al-Kaissy
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Represented By: John Dickinson Ferry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?